PNC Bank, N.A. v. Wingfield Springs Community Association et al
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Defendant: William Won Holdings, LLC and Wingfield Springs Community Association
Case Number: 3:2015cv00349
Filed: July 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting ECF No. 89 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice; the Lis Pendens recorded on 07/14/2015 as Doc. No. 4491130 is expunged; Order may be recorded in the official records of the Washoe County Recorder. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) Modified on 9/5/2018 to correct filed date.(KW).
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER approving ECF No. 69 Stipulation for Extension of Time fo PNC Bank, N.A. to File Reply in Support of ECF No. 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 4/21/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 04/06/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER lifting temporary stay. Pending motions that were denied without prejudice when the stay was imposed may be refiled within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CERTIFICATION ORDER, directing Clerk to serve a copy of this order on the NV AG (mailed 8/25/2016). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Staying Case Pending Issuance of Mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Denying Pending Motions without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE ORDER approving ECF No. 38 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, N.A. v. Wingfield Springs Community Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Won Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wingfield Springs Community Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?