Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Reno Cab Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Reno Cab Company Inc and Richard L Warne
Counter Defendant: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Counter Claimant: Reno Cab Company Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv00406
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting ECF No. 172 Stipulation for Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting ECF No. 170 Stipulated Motion to Strike and Vacate ECF No. 154 Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) Modified on 1/24/2019 to denote motion (LH).
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting ECF No. 163 Stipulation to Extend Time : Reply to ECF No. 162 Response re ECF No. 159 Motion for Reconsideration, is due by 11/9/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting ECF No. 160 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 159 Motion for Reconsideration due by Tuesday 10/30/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER that Atain Specialty Insurance Company's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order ECF No. 97 is overruled. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 02/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting ECF No. 70 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 67 MOTION to Compel due by 12/13/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Reno Cab Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Pamela A. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Pamela A. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Reno Cab Company Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Pintar
Represented By: Jonathan J Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno Cab Company Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Pintar
Represented By: Jonathan J Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L Warne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?