Gunter v. United Federal Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Tonya Gunter
Defendant: United Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2015cv00483
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting ECF No. 149 Stipulation Amending Effective Date of Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 AMENDED ORDER granting ECF No. 134 Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. The final hearing is set for 6/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 5 before Judge Miranda M. Du. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER - United's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 99 ) is denied. Gunter's motion to strike (ECF No. 108 ) is denied as moot. Gunter's motion regarding class notice (ECF No. 98 ) is denied without prejudice. The parties are instructed to work together to resolve disagreements about the class notice plan and file an amended motion to approve class by 10/7/2018. Gunter's motion for leave to file surreply (ECF No. 119 ) is granted. Gunter's motion to seal (ECF No. 109 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting ECF No. 102 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to file brief re ECF No. 99 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 1/5/2018. Reply due by 1/19/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting ECF No. 101 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to respond to ECF No. 98 Plaintiff's Report Re: Proposed Class Notice and Notice Plan. Response due by 12/29/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying United's ECF No. 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting Gunter's ECF No. 64 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 65 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting ECF No. 78 Stipulation : Reply re ECF No. 64 MOTION to Certify Class due by 4/6/2017. Response re ECF No. 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 4/6/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER - UFCU's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 25 ) is denied. Gunter's Notice of New Authority (ECF No. 56) is stricken. Gunter is granted leave to amend her Amended Complaint (ECF No. 24 ) by 7/7/2016. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER on ECF No. 54 Stipulation : Status Report due 6/14/2016. Class certification motion due by 8/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PROTECTIVE ORDER re ECF No. 49 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MDL ORDER DENYING TRANSFER - The motion to transfer, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 2/2/2016. ( MDL No. 2684 IN RE: Credit Union Checking Account Overdraft Litigation ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunter v. United Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Gunter
Represented By: Gregory G. Gordon
Represented By: Taras Kick
Represented By: Jae (Eddie) K Kim
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: Thomas A. Segal
Represented By: James Strenio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?