Western Exploration LLC et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: Churchill, County Of, Elko, County Of, Eureka, County of, Humboldt, County Of, Lander, County Of, Lincoln, County of, Nevada State of, Ninety-Six Ranch, LLC, Paragon Precious Metals, LLC, Pershing, County of, Quantum Minerals LLC, Washoe, County Of, Western Exploration LLC and White Pine, County of
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, Bill Dunkleberger, Sally Jewell, Neil Kornze, Amy Lueders, Thomas L. Tidwell, U.S. Department of Agriculture, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Forest Service and Tom Vilsack
Case Number: 3:2015cv00491
Filed: September 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 JUDGMENT Plaintiffs and Defendants competing motions for summary judgment are denied in part and granted in part. The Court grants summary judgment in favor of Defendants on all claims except for Count IV with respect to Plaintiffs Eureka County a nd Humboldt County. With respect to this count, the Court grants summary judgment in favor of Eureka County and Humboldt County on their claim that the Agencies failed to comply with NEPA. The Court remands the Records of Decision to the Agencies to prepare a supplemental environmental impact statement consistent with this Order. Intervenors Motion for Summary Judgment is denied in part and granted in part. It is granted with respect to Intervenors request that the Court not vacate the RODs or e njoin implementation of the RODs. It is further ordered that Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement Record is denied as moot. Defendants Motion to Strike is granted in part and denied in part. It is denied with respect to paragraphs 1 through 3 in Exhibit 1. It is granted with respect to the remainder of Exhibit 1 and with respect to Exhibits 2 and 6. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 03/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 109 Motion to Postpone the 2/1/2017 Hearing; denying Defendants' ECF No. 117 Motion to Postpone the Hearing. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PROTECTIVE ORDER approving ECF No. 90 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Amended ORDER re 64 Order granting 31 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction with respect to the Baker Water and Sewer General Improvement District's water tank replacement project. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER approving 60 Stipulation Regarding Expedited Briefing. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER allowing supplemental briefing re 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief due within 10 days. Responses due 10 days thereafter. Reply brief due 5 days following filing of response.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion in Limine. (See pdf order for specifics.) At the scheduled November 17, 2015, hearing, the Court will not entertain opening arguments as the Court has reviewed the briefs relating to the PI Motion. The Court will proceed first with accepting evidence before hearing arguments from counsel. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - This Order describes the scope of the November 17, 2015 hearing on the 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, which the Court finds necessary to address in light of the parties' recent filings. The hearing will be limited to the issues raised by the four Plaintiffs who filed the Motion. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL - IT IS ORDERED that the undersigned Judge recuses himself from this action.This action is referred to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for reassignment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Exploration LLC et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Tanya C. Nesbitt
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Dunkleberger
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Tanya C. Nesbitt
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Tanya C. Nesbitt
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Kornze
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Tanya C. Nesbitt
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Lueders
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Tanya C. Nesbitt
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. Tidwell
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Tanya C. Nesbitt
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Tanya C. Nesbitt
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Tanya C. Nesbitt
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Tanya C. Nesbitt
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Tanya C. Nesbitt
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Churchill, County Of
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elko, County Of
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eureka, County of
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humboldt, County Of
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lander, County Of
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincoln, County of
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada State of
Represented By: C. Wayne Howle
Represented By: Lawrence VanDyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ninety-Six Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paragon Precious Metals, LLC
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pershing, County of
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quantum Minerals LLC
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washoe, County Of
Represented By: Christopher Hicks
Represented By: Michael Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Exploration LLC
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Pine, County of
Represented By: Laura K Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?