DuShane v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Jasen Lynn DuShane
Defendant: Isidora Baca, S. L. Foster, M. Moses and Nevada Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2015cv00501
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying ECF Nos. 19 Motion for Extension of Time, 22 Motion to Strike, and 24 Motion in Support of Dismissal. It is further ordered, Plaintiff must not file any more documents in this closed case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 01/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file an updated address in compliance with this Court's order (ECF No. 13 ). The motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 1 ) is denied as moot. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file updated address with the Court within 30 days; denying as moot ECF No. 12 Motion to Stay Early Mediation Conference. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DuShane v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidora Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. L. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasen Lynn DuShane
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?