Messaad v. Reno Justice Court et al
Plaintiff: Tarik Messaad
Defendant: Chuck Allen, Reno Justice Court and Washoe, County Of
Case Number: 3:2015cv00582
Filed: December 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - Certification of Record Supplementation : The Court certifies to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals that the record should be supplemented pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 10(e)(2)(b). The Clerk is directed to transmit this certification to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. ( E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit 6/7/2017. ) USCA case 17-16111. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 2/15/2017 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: Lisa Mann; Pla Counsel: Tarik Messaad; Def Counsel: Michael Large; Court Reporter/Recorder: FTR; Recording start and end times: 2:58 PM to 3:35 PM; Time of Hearing: 37 minutes; Courtroom: 1 : The Court DENIES plaintiff's motions to strike (ECF No. 28 ) and (ECF No. 30 ). Court will not issue a discover y plan and scheduling order at this time. The Court will STAY the exchange of initial disclosures pending a ruling on plaintiffs motion for leave to amend complaint (ECF No. 24 ). 3:35 p.m. Court adjourns. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION accepting and adopting in full ECF No. 4 R&R; granting ECF No. 1 IFP application; directing Clerk to file ECF No. 1 -1 complaint; permitting the Fourth Amendment claim against Washoe Coun ty and Sheriff Allen to proceed; dismissing without prejudice, without leave to amend, the claims against Reno Justice Court and the Sixth and Fourteenth Amendment claims against all defendants; denying ECF No. 1 -2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Messaad v. Reno Justice Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno Justice Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washoe, County Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarik Messaad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?