Davis v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Rodney E. Davis
Defendant: G. Cox, Cruz, Sgt. Harding, Holbert, Nevada Department of Corrections, Nevada, State Of, Robinson, Warden G. Smith and Taylor
Case Number: 3:2015cv00607
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER dismissing without prejudice this action based on Plaintiff's failure to comply with ECF No. 84 Order; denying as moot Defendants' ECF No. 87 Motion to Stay; directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly and close case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 76 Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 9/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER - A document requesting a Court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter. If Plaintiff is seeking a settlement conference before this court, he shall file a proper motion requesting a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER adopting ECF No. 41 Report and Recommendation in its entirety. ECF Nos. 35 and 37 Motions for Summary Judgment are denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that ECF Nos. 35 Motion for Summary Judgment and 37 Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED in its entirety. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 11/07/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 4 IFP application - NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); directing Clerk to e-serve NV AG with this order and ECF No. 13 First Amen ded Complaint (NEFs sent 12/16/2016). AG to advise Court within 21 days re service. Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada, State Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?