Kelley v. Gedney et al
Plaintiff: James C. Kelley
Defendant: Karen Gedney, Shannon Moyle and John Peery
Case Number: 3:2016cv00041
Filed: January 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb (ECF No. 44 ) is accepted and adopted in full; Defendants' motion to dismiss/motion for summary judgment (ECF Nos. 23 , 24 ) are granted; Plaintiff's claim is dismissed with prejudice; Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) (Main Document 48 replaced on 8/14/2017) (KW).
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Judge enter an order GRANTING Defendants' motion (ECF No. 23 ) and entering judgment in their favor. Objections to R&R due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 1/20/2017, denying as moot Plaintiff's ECF No. 35 Motion for Issuance of Summons for Defendant Perry. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 1 IFP application - NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); directing Clerk to e-serve NV AG with this order and ECF No. 4 Complaint ( NEFs sent 10/11/2016); directing AG to advise Court within 21 days re acceptance of service. Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. The EC F No. 6 Motion to Order the AG to Accept Service is denied. The ECF No. 10 Motion for a Scheduling Order is denied as moot. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Gedney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Gedney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Moyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Kelley
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?