September 18, 2018 |
Filing
198
ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 197 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 193 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 16, 2018 |
Filing
185
ORDER re 184 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to File Supporting Exhibits in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have to and including Friday, September 7, 2018, in which to advise the court of the relevancy as to each proposed exhibit Plaintiff wishes the court (and Defendant) to still consider with respect to his motion for partial summary judgment. Plaintiff will not have to refile the exhibits.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 183 is STAYED until the court rules on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to File Supporting Exhibits in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 184 . Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
July 24, 2018 |
Filing
179
ORDER that Plaintiff's Rule 72(a) objection (ECF No. 168 ) is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
May 24, 2018 |
Filing
172
ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Move the Settlement Conference (ECF No. 171 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
February 14, 2018 |
Filing
139
ORDER denying Defendants' ECF No. 60 Motion to Reconsider; granting Defendants' ECF No. 78 Motion for Clarification; denying Plaintiff's 80 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
October 18, 2017 |
Filing
101
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 10/18/2017. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Release of Court Document ECF No. 98 is GRANTED to the extent that the Clerk shall resend Plaintiff a copy of the courts order denying Plaintiffs third motion for appointment of counsel ECF No. 81 (NEF regenerated to P via LCC law library on 10/18/2017); Plaintiff's request to issue a temporary restraining order is DENIED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
October 12, 2017 |
Filing
94
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 10/12/2017, granting in part Plaintiff's ECF No. 90 Motion to Extend Legal Copywork Limit, allowing increase of $15.00 (copy of order mailed to NDOC Chief of Inmate Services). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
September 20, 2017 |
Filing
77
JUDGMENT - Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment (ECFNo. 27 ) is GRANTED, EXCEPT as to the retaliation claim against Defendant Parks. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 22, 2017 |
Filing
68
ORDER - Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 63 ) is ADOPTED AND ACCEPTED : Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (ECF No. 45 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 17, 2017 |
Filing
66
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Judge enter an order GRANTING ECF No. 27 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, EXCEPT the motion should be DENIED as to the retaliation claim against Defendant Parks. Objections to R&R due by 8/31/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 08/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
August 4, 2017 |
Filing
63
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's ECF No. 45 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint be denied. Objections to R&R due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 3, 2017 |
Filing
62
ORDER denying 36 Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
July 27, 2017 |
Filing
59
ORDER DENYING ECF Nos. 47 , 48 Objections. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
July 20, 2017 |
Filing
58
ORDER denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to Conduct Depositions by Written Questions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
April 13, 2017 |
Filing
32
ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 29 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 27 Motion for Summary Judgment due byWednesday 5/31/2017. Plaintiff's motion is DENIED in other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 2, 2017 |
Filing
17
ORDER directing Clerk to e-serve a copy of this order and Plaintiff's ECF No. 7 Amended Complaint on NV AG (NEFs sent 2/2/2017). AG to advise Court within 21 days re service. Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|