Holden v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Jim Bass Holden
Defendant: Senior Physician Romeo Aranas, R. Bruce Banniseter, James Greg Cox, Pamela Del Porto, William Donnelly, Fey, Ted Hanf, Jim Holmes, E.K. McDaniels, Nevada, State Of and Chuck Shardin
Case Number: 3:2016cv00064
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting ECF No. 100 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER that Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time for Settlement Conference (ECF No. 95 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER - The Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 87 ) is accepted in part and rejected in part. Defendant's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 78 ) is granted in part and denied in part : Summary judgment is granted in favor of Def endants on the portion of Count IV related to Hanf's failure to order a biopsy or other testing. Summary judgment is denied as to Counts I, II, III, V, VI, VII, VIII, and the portion of Count IV related to Hanf's failure to prescribe sunscr een. The following Defendants are dismissed without prejudice for failure to effect service of process: Cegavske, Henson, Hipkin, Morrow, Stroud, and Holmes. Defendants' motion to extend time (ECF No. 89 ) is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting ECF No. 82 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 78 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting ECF No. 74 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Dispositive Motions to 2/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER that the reports and recommendations of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb ECF Nos. 59 , 62 are accepted and adopted; Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF No. 32 isdenied; Defendants' motion to strike ECF No. 51 is granted in part and denied in part; Court will not strike Plaintiff's expert witness disclosure. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Judge enter an order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ECF No. 51 Motion. Objections to R&R due by 10/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Judge enter an order DENYING ECF No. 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Objections to R&R due by 10/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 09/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting ECF No. 39 Stipulation : Responses to ECF No. 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and to ECF 37 Amended MOTION for leave to file, due by Monday, May, 8, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holden v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Physician Romeo Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bruce Banniseter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greg Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Del Porto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Hanf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada, State Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Shardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Bass Holden
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?