Orr v. City of Reno et al
Plaintiff: Brandon J. Orr
Defendant: Brian Atkinson, Chris Caprioli, Andy Carter, Reno, City Of, J. Schaur, Kevin Vogt and Edward Wilson
Case Number: 3:2016cv00122
Filed: March 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 19 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying ECF No. 17 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER accepting and adopting in its entirety ECF No. 13 Report and Recommendation; dismissing with prejudice this action; denying as moot ECF No. 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; directing Clerk to close case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ECF No. 6 is accepted and adopted in full; allowing specific claims to either proceed, or be dismissed with or without prejudice; Clerk directed to send Plaintiff sufficient copies of the Amended C omplaint ECF No. 5 and USM-285 for each defendant (5 copies of of 5 Amended Complaint/USM-285 mailed to P 11/08/2016); Plaintiff given 20 days in which to furnish U.S. Marshal with required form USM-285/amended complaint for each defendant; U.S. Marshal will then proceed with service of the summons/amended complaint on each defendant; 20 days after receiving USM-285 from U.S. Marshal showing whether service has been accomplished, Plaintiff must file a notice with the Court identifying which defendants were/were not served; Plaintiff must serve defendants and/or defendants counsel copies of all pleadings and include certificate of service; Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel is referred to Magistrate Judge Cobb for determination. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr v. City of Reno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Caprioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno, City Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Schaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon J. Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?