Bank of America, N.A. v. Sierra Cedars Condominium Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC, LVDG Series 200, LLC, Sierra Cedars Condominium Homeowners Association and Thunder Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00127
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting ECF No. 76 Stipulation of Dismissal and Quiet Title; title to the real property located 2201 Kietzke Lane #B, Reno, Nevada 89123, APN 015-314-17 will be quieted in favor of Bank of America, N.A.; all claims in this case are dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear its own attorney fees and costs. This is the final judgment of this Court. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting ECF No. 73 Second Stipulation to Extend Time. The parties must comply with this Court's October 22, 2018 order and August 22, 2018 minute order by December 5, 2018. No future requests for more time will be granted. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting ECF No. 71 Stipulation : The parties' deadline to comply with ECF 70 Order is extended to Monday, November 5, 2018. If a further extension is necessary, the parties must file their request before Monday, November 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting ECF No. 67 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 55 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 6/26/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting ECF No. 65 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to ECF No. 55 BANA's Motion for Summary Judgment (Third Request). Response due by 6/12/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting ECF No. 61 Defendants Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants response due by 5/28/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting ECF No. 58 Defendants Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants response due by 4/25/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting ECF No 56 Stipulation to Extend BANA's Deadline to Oppose ECF No. 52 Defendant Sierra Cedars Condominium Homeowners Association's motion for summary judgment. Response due by 4/11/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting ECF No. 53 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline (First Request). Dispositive Motions due by 3/21/2001. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to partially lift the stay (ECF No. 44 ) is GRANTED IN PART. The stay entered by the court on April 5, 2017, is hereby VACATED. Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 45 ), filed without l eave of court and before the stay was lifted, is hereby STRICKEN without prejudice. The proposed scheduling order (ECF No. 43 ) is referred to the magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - This action is stayed for a period of 90 days to allow the NRED mediation process to be completed. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Sierra Cedars Condominium Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC
Represented By: Jay R Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVDG Series 200, LLC
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Cedars Condominium Homeowners Association
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?