Espinosa v. Stogner et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin W. Espinosa
Defendant: Tara Carpenter, James Cox, Sheryl Foster, Robert LeGrand, William Sandie and Joseph Stogner
Case Number: 3:2016cv00141
Filed: March 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that ECF No. 40 Report and Recommendation is REJECTED, ECF No. 29 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot, and ECF No. 8 Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without leave to amend. Clerk directed to enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that the Court ADOPTS AND ACCEPTS ECF 40 Report and Recommendation; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 29 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Judge enter an order DENYING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 29 ). Objections to R&R due by 10/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting ECF No. 32 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 31 Response re ECF No. 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment by 6/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER stating that the Court will not issue a screening order on ECF No. 8 Amended Complaint; directing that the case will proceed on normal litigation track; directing that Plaintiff will not be required to pay an initial installment fee - NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); directing Plaintiff American Humanist Association to pay $400 filing fee by 10/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinosa v. Stogner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sandie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Stogner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin W. Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?