McNair v. Baca et al
Plaintiff: Clarence McNair
Defendant: Isidro Baca and Thorp
Case Number: 3:2016cv00234
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation ECF No. 43 is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 35 is GRANTED; Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 39 is DENIED AS MOOT; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Judge enter an order GRANTING Defendant Thorpe's and Defendant Baca's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 35 ); and, that Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 39 ) should be DENIED AS MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 10/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 1 IFP application - NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); directing Clerk to e-serve NV AG with a copy of this order and the ECF No. [ 4] Complaint (NEFs sent 4/7/2017); directing AG to advise Court within 21 days re appearance. Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNair v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence McNair
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?