Hart v. Baca et al
Plaintiff: Dwyane Hart
Defendant: Isidra Baca, Irvin, Moyle, Schreckengost and Ward
Case Number: 3:2016cv00274
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 20 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 17 ) is granted. It is further ordered that the Clerk enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - ECF No. 14 IFP Application is GRANTED. Clerk shall e-SERVE a copy of this order and a copy of ECF No. 4 Complaint upon AG. (E-service 5/23/2017; Complaint via NEF Regeneration.) AG shall file notice re acceptance of service by 6/13/2017; and file under seal address(es) for Ds for which service not accepted. P shall file a motion re any unserved Ds. If service accepted, the Answer/response due by 7/22/2017. Henceforth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING as moot ECF No. 1 IFP Application. Clerk SHALL SEND P approved non-prisoner IFP form. (Mailed 4/20/2017.) P shall file fully complete IFP form, or pay $400 filing fee by 5/20/2017. Upon the resolution of the matter of the filing fee this Court will issue a subsequent order on the matter of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidra Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schreckengost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwyane Hart
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?