Eubanks v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Charles Eubanks
Respondent: Renee Baker and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2016cv00336
Filed: June 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that Petitioner's motion for stay and abeyance (ECF No. 48 ) is granted; this action is stayed pending exhaustion of Petitioner's unexhausted claims; the grant of a stay is conditioned upon Petitioner returning to this Court with a motion to reopen within 45 days of issuance of the remittitur by the Supreme Court of Nevada at the conclusion of the state court proceedings; Respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 45 ) is denied without prejudice; all pending m otions for extension of time (ECF Nos. 44 , 46 , and 49 ) are granted nunc pro tunc as of their respective filing dates; Clerk directed to administratively close this action, until such time as the Court grants a motion to reopen the matter. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting ECF No. 37 Motion for Leave to amend; Clerk directed to file the third amended petition for writ of habeas corpus attached to ECF No. 37 -1; ECF No. 39 Respondents' motion for extension of time ECF No. 39 is denied as moot; respondents answer/response to the petition due 12/24/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED that petitioner's motion for leave to amend (ECF No. 29 ) is granted. Amended petition for writ of habeas corpus due by June 5, 2017. Answer/response to petition due 60 days after filing of amended petition. Reply due 45 days afte r service of answer; Response to Reply due 30 days thereafter. If respondents file a motion to dismiss, petitioner will have 30 days following service of the motion to file and serve an opposition to the motion. Respondents will thereafter have 30 days following service of the opposition to the motion to file and serve a reply. Petitioner's motion to partially waive Local Rule IA 10-3(E) (ECF No. 28 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing counsel for Petitioner to contact Petitioner as soon as reasonably possible. Amended petition due within 60 days, answer due within 60 days thereafter, and reply due within 45 days after answer. ECF No. 10 Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc as of 8/11/2016. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Clerk shall file petition and motions attached to ECF No. 1 IFP application. Clerk shall add AG as counsel for respondents and electronically serve copy of petition and this order on respondents (served via NEF). Respondents shall hav e 20 days to appear. Motion for appointment of counsel is granted. FPD appointed. Clerk to electronically serve upon FPD copy of petition and this order (served via NEF). FPD will have 20 days to file notice of appearance or indicate inability to do so. Motion for leave to file excess pages is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eubanks v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?