Dickerson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Defendant: |
McCarthy & Holthus, LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wilmington Trust Company and Wilmington Trust National, N.A. |
775) 786-7466 (fax: |
Jeffrey A. Dickerson |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00375 |
Filed: |
June 24, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Valerie P. Cooke |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 23, 2019 |
Filing
110
ORDER granting 109 Stipulation of Dismissal; ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
|
October 25, 2019 |
Filing
108
ORDER approving ECF No. 105 Stipulation re ECF No. 102 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 11/11/2019. Reply due by 11/26/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
October 23, 2019 |
Filing
107
ORDER granting ECF No. 106 Motion to Remove Attorney Robin E. Perkins from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
September 6, 2019 |
Filing
101
ORDER granting ECF No. 100 Stipulation: Wells Fargo's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/27/2019. Response due by 10/18/2019. Reply due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
June 13, 2019 |
Filing
97
ORDER on Mandate re ECF No. 87 Notice of Appeal, ECF No. 95 USCA Memorandum/Opinion, USCA case 18-15261; setting Telephonic Status Conference for 7/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Counsel to dial from a l and line into the AT&T Meet-Me-Line (1-888-675-2535), Access Code 2900398, Security Code 072219, five minutes prior to hearing. Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
February 14, 2018 |
Filing
85
ORDER - The Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 80 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the default against Wilmington Trust Co. is SET ASIDE, and Wilmington Trust Co. is DISMISSED as a Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
April 13, 2017 |
Filing
49
ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 46 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The fraud claim is dismissed. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 12, 2016 |
Filing
37
ORDER denying ECF No. 6 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting in part and denying in part, with leave to amend ECF No. 12 Motion to Dismiss. All claims are dismissed except the claim for breach of contract against Wells Far go and QLS. Plaintiff may amend the other claims within 14 days of the entry of this Order. All Defendants except Wells Fargo and QLS are dismissed.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ECF Nos. 19 Motion for Leave to File; 28 Motion to Stay and 29 Motion for Leave to File a Surreponse are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
October 25, 2016 |
Filing
32
ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 28 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing
26
ORDER granting ECF NO. 25 Stipulation and Order to Extend time. Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave and Reply in Support of Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss due by 10/14/2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 09/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
July 12, 2016 |
Filing
5
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 7/12/2016, granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 4 Stipulation re ECF No. 1 Petition. Wells Fargo Bank NA answer due 8/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?