Reader et al v. HG Staffing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paul Allen, Wendy Basallo, Justine Bradley, Alexis Bryant, Tiffany Carrera, Shenna Corral, Katherine Dowling, Shelley Faust, Caitlin Gunn, Liz Heeran, Bridgette Hines, Imogen Holt, Stephanie Knauss, Justine Lang, Mark Larson, George Lopes, II, Sandra Martinez, Malcolm McCaskill, Joseph McKee, Maria McKenzie, Callie Miano, Tony Moran, Jennifer Nichols, Karolina Olech, Natalie Ordas, Arlene Osorman, Kathryn Owen, Steve Pierce, Roxanne Primus, Sara Reader, Lawrence Riordan, Sr., Gay Roberts, Melissa Rosina, Misty Shelby, Brandi Smith, Krysta Steigler, Dellena Thompson and Robert Tranchida
Defendant: HG Staffing, LLC and MEI-GSR Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00387
Filed: June 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDERED that this case is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is ordered to close the case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER re ECF No. 95 Motion for Clarification (see order for details); giving Plaintiffs 30 days to withdraw their ECF No. 78 Motion to Dismiss or consent to the dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/27/(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER that plaintiffs' motion to voluntarily dismiss the action (ECF No. 78 ) is GRANTED on the condition that it be with prejudice. Plaintiffs have until 4/12/2019 to withdraw their motion or consent to the dismissa l despite the condition. A failure to respond within the 30 day window shall constitute a consent to dismissal with prejudice. Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 79 ) is conditionally DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 69 Stipulation Re: 64 Motion to Stay Case. Replies due by 2/14/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting ECF No. 65 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 64 Motion to Stay Case due by Wednesday 1/31/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting ECF No. 59 Stipulation to Exceed Page Limit of Reply to ECF No. 52 Response re ECF No. 49 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ECF No. 50 Stipulation for Extension of Time to file Response to ECF No. 49 Motion for Circulation of Notice. Response due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class ECF No. 26 is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 22 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 15 ) is GRANTED in part as to Plaintiffs Sara Reader, Shenna Corral, and Imogen Holt. Plaintiffs Reader, Corral, and Holt are dismissed f rom this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 15 ) is DENIED in part as to the remaining named plaintiffs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' original complaint (ECF No. 12 ) is DENIED as moot . Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Because the current actions are related to Case No. 3:13-cv-00453-LRH-WGC and should have been so designated at the time of filing (of instant case) (LR 42-1(a)), the undersigned refers each of these cases to the Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 7/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 7/6/2016 to correct grammar, punctuation, and reference to instant case(DRM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reader et al v. HG Staffing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Allen
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Basallo
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Bradley
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Bryant
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Carrera
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenna Corral
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Dowling
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Faust
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlin Gunn
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liz Heeran
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Hines
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imogen Holt
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Knauss
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Lang
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Larson
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lopes, II
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Martinez
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm McCaskill
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McKee
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria McKenzie
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Callie Miano
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Moran
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Nichols
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karolina Olech
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Ordas
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Osorman
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Owen
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Pierce
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Primus
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Reader
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Riordan, Sr.
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gay Roberts
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Rosina
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Shelby
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Smith
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krysta Steigler
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dellena Thompson
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tranchida
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HG Staffing, LLC
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEI-GSR Holdings LLC
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?