Benson et al v. HG Staffing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Aguilar, Dinora Baca, Cathy Benson, Pricilla Calvert, Jose Cano, Phung Cao, Dinh Cao-Truong, Maria Carrillo, Maria Castellanos, May Chan, Maria Chavarin, Maria Chavez-Trujillo, Wu Chen, Ging Chung, Ismaela Cruz, Karen D'Agostino, Teresa Davis, Anjanette Day, Rosalba Diaz, Myrina Drummer, Diana Ellison, Siu Fong, Jacqueline Forster, Luzviminada Galindo, Ben Gallardo, Leticia Garcia, Marixa Garcia, Aurora Garcia De Jacinto, Maria Garcia-Leon, Floyd Glover, Maria Gonzalez, Quan Huang, Xiu Xia Huang, Chiu Hui, Manuela Hurtado, Evangeline Juarez, Maricela Juarez, Cristina Kirk, Cui Kuang, Jian Kuang, Fong Lam, Yue Lee, Xiu Li, Zhong Li, Tu Long, Maria Marquez, Maria Martinez, Manuel Mejia, Rosalba Mendez, Sara Montoya, Denise Navarro, Maria Oliva, Domitrini Ordoveza, Ana Ornelas, Rosa Padilla, Cecilia Palacios, Ana Palomino-Diaz, Carri Pearson, Margarita Pelaez, Maria Ramirez, Marissa Ramos, Teresa Ramos, Maria Ruiz, Marybel Ruiz-Castillo, Estela Saldana, Katrina Scaubato, Imelda Solorzano-Yanes, Ayla Squartsoff, Elodia Torres-Dearellano, Do Tran, Bernarda Trujillo, Maricela Urbina, Delia Veliz-Clavel, Shu Want, Fu Wei, Bettye Williams, Jin Xiao, Yi Xu, Juan Zhen, Xuelan Zhong and Boquan Zhu
Defendant: HG Staffing, LLC and MEI-GSR Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00388
Filed: June 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDERED that this case is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is ordered to close the case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER that plaintiffs have until 4/26/2019 to withdraw their motion or consent to the dismissal despite the condition. A failure to respond within the 30-day window shall constitute a consent to dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER that plaintiffs' motion to voluntarily dismiss the action (ECF No. 73 ) is GRANTED on the condition that it be with prejudice. Plaintiffs have until 4/12/2019 to withdraw their motion or consent to the dismissa l despite the condition. A failure to respond within the 30 day window shall constitute a consent to dismissal with prejudice. Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 74 ) is conditionally DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Stipulation Re: 60 Motion to Stay Case. Replies due by 2/14/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting ECF No. 61 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 60 Motion to Stay Case due by Wednesday 1/31/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ECF No. 47 Stipulation For Extension of Time to respond to ECF No. 46 Motion for Circulation of Notice. Defendants' response due 12/1/2017. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class ECF No. 26 is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 22 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ECF No. 15 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as to Plaintiff Cathy Benson; Plaintiff Benson is dismissed from action; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' original complaint ECF No. 12 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 03/01/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Because the current actions are related to Case No. 3:13-cv-00453-LRH-WGC and should have been so designated at the time of filing (of instant case) (LR 42-1(a)), the undersigned refers each of these cases to the Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 7/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson et al v. HG Staffing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Aguilar
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinora Baca
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Benson
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pricilla Calvert
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Cano
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phung Cao
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinh Cao-Truong
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Castellanos
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: May Chan
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Chavarin
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Chavez-Trujillo
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wu Chen
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ging Chung
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismaela Cruz
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen D'Agostino
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Davis
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anjanette Day
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalba Diaz
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrina Drummer
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Ellison
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siu Fong
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Forster
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luzviminada Galindo
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Gallardo
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Garcia
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marixa Garcia
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora Garcia De Jacinto
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Garcia-Leon
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Glover
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gonzalez
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quan Huang
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiu Xia Huang
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiu Hui
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuela Hurtado
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evangeline Juarez
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricela Juarez
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Kirk
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cui Kuang
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jian Kuang
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fong Lam
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yue Lee
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiu Li
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhong Li
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tu Long
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Marquez
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Martinez
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Mejia
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalba Mendez
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Montoya
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Navarro
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Oliva
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domitrini Ordoveza
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Ornelas
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Padilla
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Palacios
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Palomino-Diaz
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carri Pearson
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Pelaez
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ramirez
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Ramos
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Ramos
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ruiz
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marybel Ruiz-Castillo
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estela Saldana
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Scaubato
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imelda Solorzano-Yanes
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayla Squartsoff
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elodia Torres-Dearellano
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Do Tran
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernarda Trujillo
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricela Urbina
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Veliz-Clavel
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shu Want
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fu Wei
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettye Williams
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jin Xiao
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yi Xu
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Zhen
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuelan Zhong
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boquan Zhu
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HG Staffing, LLC
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEI-GSR Holdings, LLC
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?