Bank of America, N.A. v. Aspen Meadows Fernley Flood Control Facility Maintenance Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Aspen Meadows - Fernley Flood Control Facility Maintenance Association, Comstock Capital Partners, LLC, Kern & Associates, Ltd. and Remedy Property Partners, LLC
Cross Defendant: Aspen Meadows - Fernley Flood Control Facility Maintenance Association
Counter Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Counter Claimant: Comstock Capital Partners, LLC and Remedy Property Partners, LLC
Cross Claimant: Comstock Capital Partners, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00413
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 63 ) is granted as to Plaintiff's first claim for relief; Aspen Meadows' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 64 ) is denied; Aspen Meadows' motion for summ ary judgment (ECF No. 65 ) is denied; Plaintiff's motion for leave to file supplemental authorities (ECF No. 68 ) is denied as moot; Clerk directed to enter judgment in Plaintiff's favor on both its first claim for relief, and Comstocks counterclaim (ECF No. 7 at 4-8), in accordance with this order, and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting ECF No. 71 Stipulation : Replies to ECF Nos. 69 , 70 Responses re ECF Nos. 63 , 64 Motions due by 10/24/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting ECF No. 66 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadlines for ECF Nos. 64 Motion to Dismiss and 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. BANA's response/opposition due by 9/30/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting ECF No. 49 Stipulation to Extend Time for response to ECF No. 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 1/15/2018. Reply due by 1/29/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER lifting temporary stay. Pending motions that were denied without prejudice when the stay was imposed may be refiled within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Staying Case Pending Issuance of Mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Denying Pending Motions without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Aspen Meadows Fernley Flood Control Facility Maintenance Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Aspen Meadows - Fernley Flood Control Facility Maintenance Association
Represented By: J. William Ebert
Represented By: Megan H Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Meadows - Fernley Flood Control Facility Maintenance Association
Represented By: J. William Ebert
Represented By: Megan H Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comstock Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: James M Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern & Associates, Ltd.
Represented By: Karen M. Ayarbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remedy Property Partners, LLC
Represented By: James M Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Comstock Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: James M Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Remedy Property Partners, LLC
Represented By: James M Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Comstock Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: James M Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?