January 21, 2021 |
Filing
134
ORDER DISMISSING CASE - The Stipulation of Dismissal (ECF No. 133 ) is granted. All claims as between The Bank of New York Mellon and Defendant Highland Ranch Homeowners Association are dismissed with prejudice. Each party to this stipulation shall bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
December 29, 2020 |
Filing
131
ORDER - A Calendar Call via Zoom Video is set for Monday, January 11, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 by videoconference before Judge Robert C. Jones. The parties are directed to contact the courtroom deputy Lesa Ettinger (Lesa_Ettinger@ nvd.uscourts.gov or 775-686-5833) by Noon, Tuesday, January 5, 2021, to provide her the e-mail address of each counsel, party and/or representative attending the hearing. Video Conference Instructions are to be adhered to as specified herein. The Public may access and listen to the Hearing as follows: Public telephonic participants shall call AT&T no later than five (5) minutes prior to the hearing at 1 (888) 675-2535. Access Code is 2900398, Security Code 011121. Per sons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
September 8, 2020 |
Filing
126
ORDER granting ECF No. 125 Stipulation. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by September 22, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
September 1, 2020 |
Filing
124
ORDER approving ECF No. 123 Stipulation Regarding Excess Proceeds. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 17, 2020 |
Filing
122
ORDER granting ECF No. 119 Stipulation : Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
July 8, 2020 |
Filing
116
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 93 ) is GRANTED.Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 86 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART.Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 87 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
June 1, 2020 |
Filing
115
ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 114 Stipulation : Calendar Call VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 9/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Jury Trial VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 9/21/2020 at 8:30 AM in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 4, 2020 |
Filing
112
ORDER granting ECF No. 111 Stipulation to Extend Time re ECF No. 93 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 3/9/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
February 19, 2020 |
Filing
110
ORDER granting ECF No. 109 Stipulation to Extend Time re ECF No. 93 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 3/2/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW) Modified on 2/19/2020 to correct typo(LW).
|
February 18, 2020 |
Filing
108
ORDER granting ECF No. 105 Stipulation. BoNYM shall have up to and including February 24, 2020, to file its replies in support of its motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 93 ). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
February 5, 2020 |
Filing
103
ORDER granting ECF No. 102 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 98 Response re ECF No. 86 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/13/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
January 16, 2020 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting ECF No. 96 Stipulation to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 86 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/23/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
January 9, 2020 |
Filing
92
ORDER granting ECF No. 91 Stipulation to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 86 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/16/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 20, 2019 |
Filing
89
ORDER approving ECF No. 83 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Gayle A. Kern Ltd dba Kern & Associates Ltd. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
November 5, 2019 |
Filing
82
ORDER granting ECF No. 81 Stipulation re ECF No. 1 Complaint. Kern & Associates Ltd. answer/response due by 11/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
September 20, 2019 |
Filing
76
ORDER approving ECF No. 75 Stipulation re ECF No. 1 Complaint. Kern & Associates Ltd. answer due 11/5/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
May 23, 2017 |
Filing
52
ORDER denying ECF No. 47 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
December 6, 2016 |
Filing
46
JUDGMENT re ECF No. 45 Order granting in part and denying in part ECF Nos. 8 , 18 Motions to Dismiss and ECF No. 21 Countermotion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Clerk of Court Lance S. Wilson on 12/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting ECF No. 27 Stipulation and Order to Extend Date for Highland Ranch Homeowners Association to file its Reply in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Bank of New York Mellon's Countemotion for Summary Judgment. Reply and Opposition due by 10/3/2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 09/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|