Rosaschi v. Wickham et al
Petitioner: Jamie Rosaschi
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Harold Wickham
Case Number: 3:2016cv00442
Filed: July 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Petitioner's ECF No. 20 Motion to Dismiss, dismissing with prejudice this case; denying a certificate of appealability; directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly and close case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Petitioner's motion for extension of time to file a motion to reopen this case (ECF No. 18 ) is granted. Petitioner must file the motion to reopen by 5/30/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting ECF No. 13 motion to stay proceedings; action stayed pending conclusion of postconviction proceedings in state court; Clerk directed to administratively close this action until the Court grants a motion to reopen the action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. 9 ) is granted. The FPD is appointed to represent petitioner. Clerk shall e-serve the FPD a copy of this order, together with a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 7 ). (E-service 6/6/2017; Petition via NEF re-generation.) FPD shall file a notice of appearance by 7/6/2017. Counsel for petitioner meet with petitioner as soon as reasonably possible. Amended petition due by 9/4/2017. Answer/response t o amended petition due 45 days after service; Response to answer due 30 days thereafter. Any state court record exhibits must be filed with an index of exhibits as specified herein; and courtesy copies provided to Reno "Staff Attorney". Respondents' motion for extension of time (ECF No. 10 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Clerk to file and e-serve ECF No. 1 -1 Petition on Respondents (NV AG added, NEF sent 12/12/2016). Response to petition due within 90 days; reply due within 45 days thereafter. Any state court exhibits to be filed with separate ind ex. Hard copies of any exhibits shall be forwarded for this case to staff attorneys in Reno. Clerk directed to file ECF No. 1 -2 Motion for Appointment of counsel -- motion denied. ECF No. 3 Motion for Judicial Action denied as moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosaschi v. Wickham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harold Wickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jamie Rosaschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?