Carra Otto vs Midwestern, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Carra Otto
Defendant: Midwestern, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00451
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER dismissing with prejudice this action per ECF No. 191 Stipulation. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER that Refacciones Neumaticas La Paz, S.A. DE C.V.'s crossclaims for contribution and indemnification it filed against F & H Mine Supply and MidWestern, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. It is further ordered that F & H Mine Supply's third party complaint against International Mine Supply, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDERED that F & H and RNP must file a status report within ten days. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting ECF No. 179 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Mid-Western, LLC Only. (Defendant Midwestern, LLC terminated.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting ECF No. 173 Stipulation : Responses to ECF No. 165 , 166 , 167 Motions due by 8/6/2019. Replies due by 8/27/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER approving ECF No. 170 Stipulation re ECF No. 165 Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 166 Motion Exclude Quent Augspurger's Expert Opinions and Testimony, and ECF No. 167 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/30/2019. Replies due by 8/20/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting ECF No. 163 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to F & H Mine Supply Only. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER re [ECF No. 160) Hearing regarding Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. Upon review of the papers and consideration of oral argument buy counsel, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant Reffaciones Neumaticas La Paz, S.A., DE C.V.'s Emergency Motion for Protective Order (ECF No. 157 ) is hereby DENIED. That the deposition of Defendant Reffaciones 30(b)(6) witness is to be completed by April 22, 2019. Pl aintiffs' request that the RNP PMK deposition be taken in the U.S. (ECF No. 159 ) is GRANTED. The deposition shall be held in the United States, in Reno, Nevada. That Plaintiffs shall pay the reasonable costs of travel and lod ging for the deponent. That the deposition of Plaintiffs' expert Quent Augspurger shall also be rescheduled to be completed by April 22, 2019. That discovery shall remain open only as between Plaintiffs and RNP for an additional thirty (30) days for the purposes of these two depositions. The deadline for dispositive motions is extended - for the last time - to Friday, May 31, 2019. The deadline for filing the Joint Pretrial Order (assuming no dispositive motions are pending) is extended to Friday, June 28, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting ECF No. 106 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 104 Motion to Exclude Testimony due by 11/1/2018. Reply due by 11/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 8/30/2017 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb.. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: William C. Jeanney (Present); Def Counsel: Brian Walters (Telephonically); Recorder: FTR; Recording start and end times: 1:34:59 p.m. - 1:44:27 p.m.; Courtroom: 2. In light of the revelation that Refacciones Neumaticas La Paz S.A. DE C.V., has moved and changed its address, and, in view of the pro tocol that must be observed to successfully serve an international entity, plaintiff's motion for additional time to serve Refacciones Neumaticas La Paz S.A. DE C.V., (ECF No. 55 ) is GRANTED. Service must be completed no later than Friday, 12/8/2017, as to international defendant Refacciones Neumaticas La Paz S.A. DE C.V. The court schedules a status conference Tuesday, 12/12/2017, at 10:00 a.m., in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judg e William G. Cobb. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically shall dial 1-877-873-8017, enter the access code 3416460, andenter the security code 121217 approximately five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting ECF No. 14 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendant F&H Mine Supply, Inc.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (First Request); F & H Mine Supply answer due 11/23/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/01/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting ECF No. 6 Stipulation : Plaintiffs may file the Proposed First Amended Complaint substituting Defendants Refacciones Neumaticas La Paz, S.A., and F&H Mine Supply, Inc. in place of Defendant Midwestern, LLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Midwestern, LLC is dismissed once the First Amended Complaint has been filed. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carra Otto vs Midwestern, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwestern, LLC
Represented By: Joseph E Balkenbush
Represented By: Stephen C. Balkenbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carra Otto
Represented By: William C. Jeanney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?