Federal Housing Finance Agency, et al vs Thunder Properties, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing Finance Agency and Federal National Mortgage Association |
Defendant: |
Thunder Properties, Inc, a Nevada Corporation |
Unknown: |
John H. Maddock, III |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00461 |
Filed: |
August 2, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 1, 2021 |
Filing
107
ORDER granting ECF No. 106 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List as to Attorneys Jamie K Combs and Tenesa S Powell for Bayview Loan Servicing LLC, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, and Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
April 30, 2021 |
Filing
104
ORDER granting ECF No. 103 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Andrew A. Bao for Plaintiff Ditech Financial LLC. Attorney Colt B. Dodrill removed from case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
August 11, 2020 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting ECF No. 96 Stipulation to Dismiss Certain Properties with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
January 30, 2020 |
Filing
88
ORDER granting ECF No. 87 Stipulation to Extend Time re ECF No. 86 Motion for Reconsideration. Response due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
43
FINAL JUDGMENT re ECF No. 42 Proposed Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
June 14, 2017 |
Filing
41
ORDERED that the Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 33 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The previous order (ECF No. 32 ) is VACATED IN PART as to the Supremacy Clause-§ 4617(j)(3) issue. The motion is otherwise denied. IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that the Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 36) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are entitled to offensive summary judgment on all Properties under the Due Process Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days, Plaintiffs shall submit a proposed form of judgment consistent with this order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
April 13, 2017 |
Filing
32
ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 22 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Summary judgment is granted in favor of Plaintiffs under 12 U.S.C. § 4617(j)(3) as to the Voyage Drive Property and under the Due Process Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment as to the Meeks Bay Court, Mount Logan Street, Sharlands Avenue, Voyage Drive, and Desert Peach Drive Properties. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing
16
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 2/8/2017 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: Leslie Hart (present obo: Federal Housing Finance Agency and Federal Home Loan Mortga ge Corporation) and Kelly Dove (telephonically obo: Federal National Mortgage Association); Def Counsel: Timothy Rhoda (telephonically); Recorder: FTR; Recording start and end times: 11:01:39 a.m. - 11:28:29 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. The parties' 13 Joint Motion for Leave to Extend the Deadline to File a Motion to Lift the Stay is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Plaintiffs Federal Housing Finance Agency and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corpora tion 14 Motion to Lift Stay and Enter Proposed Scheduling Order is GRANTED in part. The court imposes the deadline of 2/22/2017 for Plaintiffs to submit their amended complaint. Additionally, the deadline for initial disclosures as to all parties is also 2/22/2017. The following briefing schedule regarding dispositive motions addressing Bourne Valley is as follows: Dispositive motion based on Bourne Valley: 3/17/2017; Response to the motion: 4/14/2017; Counter dispositive motion (if contemplated by Defendant): 4/14/2017; Reply to response to dispositive motion: 4/28/2017; Response to a counter dispositive motion (if necessary): 5/ 5/2017. Plaintiffs' request that all discovery in the case be stayed until the resolution of dispositive motions based on Bourne Valley (ECF No. 14 , pg. 2, ¶ 5) is DENIED in part. The following scheduling order is enter ed: Discovery Cut Off: 10/27/2017; Dispositive Motion(s): 11/30/2017; Joint Pretrial Order: 12/29/2017. An Interim Status Conference is set for Friday, 4/7/2017 at 10:00 a.m. , in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate William G. Cobb. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically shall dial 1-877-873-8017, enter the access code 3416460, and enter the security code 4717 approximately five (5) minutes prior to the hearing.The parties shall file a joint status report no later than close of business 4/4/2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?