HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-AP2 v. Thunder Properties Inc. et al
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Defendant: Eagle Canyon Association, Red Rock Financial Services, LLC and Thunder Properties Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00467
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting ECF No. 51 Stipulation Regarding Dismissal of Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDERED that Plaintiff's pending Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 31 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to refile. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Status Report and/or a Stipulation to Dismiss this action on or before August 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that the parties shall file a status report with the Court and/or a stipulated dismissal on or before 6/8/2018 at 5:00 PM. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting ECF No. 45 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement; Oral Argument set for 4/16/18 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting ECF No. 42 Stipulation re ECF No. 31 Motion for Summary Judgment: Reply due by 3/21/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER approving ECF No. 38 Stipulation re ECF No. 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due 1/31/2018. Reply due by 2/21/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting ECF No. 32 Stipulation for Extension of Time to respond to ECF No. 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Thunder Properties Inc. response due by 1/29/2018. Plaintiff's reply due by 2/19/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting ECF No. 33 Stipulation Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Dispositive Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 16 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-AP2 v. Thunder Properties Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Canyon Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rock Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Properties Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Nathan Guy Kanute
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?