Berry v. Baca et al
Petitioner: Robert Logan Berry, Jr.
Respondent: Isidro Baca and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2016cv00470
Filed: August 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that Petitioner's unopposed motion to extend time (ECF No. 38 ) is granted. Petitioner will have up to and including July 20, 2020, to file a reply to the answer (ECF No. 35 ).Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting ECF No. 36 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner will have up to and including July 6, 2020, to file a reply to the Answer (ECF No. 35 ). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 28 ) is denied. Respondents will have 45 days from the date of entry of this order to file and serve an answer. Petitioner will have 45 days from the date on which the answer is served to file a reply. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting ECF No. 29 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 28 Motion to Dismiss due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Answer/response to ECF Nos. 24 / 25 Amended petition due by 6/17/2019. Reply to answer due 45 days thereafter. (See pdf order for additional deadline specifics.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that petitioner's motion for relief from judgment ECF No. 13 is granted; order and the judgment dismissing this action ECF Nos. 10 and 11 are vacated; petitioner's motion for leave to file an amended petition ECF No. 14 is granted; petitioner to file amended petition by 11/26/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting ECF No. 19 Motion to Extend Time : Reply to ECF No. 17 Response re ECF No. 14 Motion to amend complaint due by 3/16/2018. Reply to ECF No. 18 Response re ECF No. 13 Motion for relief from judgment due by 3/16/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting ECF No. 15 Motion for Enlargement of Time (First Request) to respond to ECF Nos. 13 motion for relief from judgment and 14 motion for leave to file an amended petition. Responses due by 2/20/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/26/2017) (DRM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Logan Berry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?