Bank of America, N.A., v. Yorkshire Manor I Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: |
Bank of America, N.A., |
Defendant: |
Strada Properties, LLC and Yorkshire Manor I Homeowners Association |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00475 |
Filed: |
August 10, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 14, 2019 |
Filing
86
ORDER granting ECF No. 85 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/14/2019. Attorney Scott Robert Lachman terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
February 11, 2019 |
Filing
79
ORDER that BANA's wrongful foreclosure claim is dismissed as moot; Clerk directed to enter judgment in favor of BANA declaring that the foreclosure sale at issue in this case did not extinguish BANA's first deed of trust and to close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
January 14, 2019 |
Filing
74
ORDER that Strada's motion for summary judgment ECF No. 49 and Yorkshire's motion for summary judgment ECF No. 54 are denied; BANA's motion for summary judgment ECF No. 55 is granted; the Court grants summary judg ment in favor of BANA on its quiet title and declaratory relief claims and on Strada's counterclaim to quiet title; BANA is directed to file a status report to indicate whether it intends to pursue the remaining wrongful foreclosure claim. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
May 14, 2018 |
Filing
67
ORDER on ECF No. 66 Stipulation : Replies re ECF Nos. 54 , 55 Motions for Summary Judgment, due by 5/30/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
May 7, 2018 |
Filing
63
ORDER granting ECF No. 62 Stipulation : Reply to Bank of America, N.A.'s Opposition to Joinder to Defendant Strada Properties, LLC'S Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF 53 ) and Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/14/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
April 25, 2018 |
Filing
61
ORDER granting ECF No. 58 Stipulation : Yorkshire Manor I Homeowners Association's Response to ECF No. 55 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/9/2018. Reply due by 5/23/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 20, 2018 |
Filing
51
ORDER granting ECF No. 50 Stipulation for Extension of Time for BANA to Respond to Strada Properties, LLC's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 49 ). Response due by 4/2/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
August 11, 2016 |
Filing
6
CERTIFICATION ORDER, directing Clerk to serve a copy of this order on the NV AG (mailed 8/11/2016). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?