Lewis v. Reno Police et al
Plaintiff: Aubrey U. Lewis, Sr.
Defendant: Reno Police Department, Washoe County Jail and Washoe County Medical Staff
Case Number: 3:2016cv00478
Filed: August 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Defendants' motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 27 and 38 ); dismissal is without prejudice; Clerk directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that (1) Plaintiff may PROCEED with claims Count I and Count II; (2) dismissing without prejudice Defendants The City of Reno, Washoe County Jail and Washoe County Medical; (3) Clerk directed to issue Summonses for Defenda nts Pruyn, Della, Moss and Dr. Han and deliver same to U.S. Marshal for service with the Amended Complaint ECF No. 23 (delivered to U.S. Marshal's Office 3/29/2017); Clerk directed to send Plaintiff 4 USM-285-form; Plaintiff has 20 days to com plete the USM-285 form and return them to the U.S. Marshal to complete service upon the Defendants; Plaintiff to file a notice with the Court indicating whether the Defendants were served within 20 days after receiving a copy of the USM-285 form from the U.S. Marshal showing whether service has been accomplished; Plaintiff is reminded that pursuant to the courts prior order, he must complete service on or before June 2, 2017; and (4) Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 03/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Amended Complaint deadline: 4/18/2017. Completion of service of summons and complaint due by 6/2/2017. Clerk shall mail this Order to P at the two addresses specified herein. (Mailed 2/16/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - # 1 IFP Application is GRANTED. However P is still required to pay full filing fee over time. $4.72 initial partial filing fee due; and monthly payments due from agency having custody over Plaintiff as specified herein. (Copy of Order mailed to WCDF Inmate Accounts Clerk on 8/23/2016.) The Complaint shall proceed on the Fourth and Fourteenth Amendment claims outlined herein. Clerk shall FILE the complaint (ECF No. 1 -1). A copy of this order and the complaint shall be sent to Th e City of Reno, and Washoe County.( Mailed 8/23/2016.) The City of Reno and Washoe County shall by 9/22/2016 enter a limited appearance for the purpose of responding to limited discovery designed to identify the doe defendants referenced in Plaint iffs complaint; and interrogatories shall proceed as specified herein. Plaintiff is provided 120 days from the date of this Order to serve the defendants with a copy of the summons and complaint. (See pdf order for additional specifics.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Reno Police et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey U. Lewis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washoe County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washoe County Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?