Woods vs City of Reno, et al
Plaintiff: Woods, Cathy Woods and Anita Carter
Defendant: City of Reno, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis, Lawrence C. Dennison, Washoe, County Of, John L Kimpton, Donald W Ashley, Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Reno, City Of and Douglas Matthew Burks
Petitioner: Oregon Department of Corrections and Recordkeeper Nickie Basinger
Case Number: 3:2016cv00494
Filed: August 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Valerie P Cooke
2 Judge: Miranda M Du
3 Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 280 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0978-6177100. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement) (Byrd, Edwin)
September 18, 2020 Filing 279 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #270 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,,,, by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. Payment was made (2020-09-18 09:27:39 Notice of Appeal(3:16-cv-00494-MMD-DJA) [appeal ntcapp] ( 505.00) CreditCard $ 505.00). QC assisted in filing the appeal to avoid filer being charged twice. (LE)
September 18, 2020 Filing 278 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark W. Dunagan on behalf of Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Dunagan, Mark)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER - Regarding ECF Nos. #274 Motion and #275 Joinder, Defendants City of Reno and Lawrence C. Dennison are provided an extension of time to file a Notice of Appeal re ECF No. #270 Order of an additional 30 days after the time prescribed by Rule 4(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure expires. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting ECF No. #274 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants are provided an extension of time to file a Notice of Appeal for the ECF No. #270 Order of an additional 30 days after the time prescribed by Rule 4(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure expires. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
August 14, 2020 Filing 275 JOINDER to #274 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hughs, Mark)
August 14, 2020 Filing 274 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) Time to File Notice of Appeal re #270 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,,,, by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Byrd, Edwin)
July 27, 2020 Filing 273 Joint STATUS REPORT regarding mediation date by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Wang, Elizabeth)
July 22, 2020 Filing 272 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/22/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Court has been informed that the parties are pursuing private mediation. The minute order (ECF No. 271 ) is amended as follows: 1) the parties are directed to file a status report of the scheduled settlement conference date within 5 days; and 2) the joint pretrial order will be due 30 days from the settlement conference date. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 21, 2020 Filing 271 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/21/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The joint pretrial order will be due within 30 days after the date a settlement conference is held. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to file sur-reply on the summary judgment motions (ECF No. #262 ) is denied. It is further ordered that Defendants City of Reno and Lawrence Dennison's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. #206 ) and Defendants Donald Ashley and Clarence Lewis' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. #216 ) are granted in part and denied in part. They are granted as to Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment claim as to Lewis, Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment claim as to Lewis, Plaintiff's conspiracy claims against all Defendants, and Plaintiff's failure to intervene claim against Ashley. The motions are denied as to all remaining claims and Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 20, 2020 Filing 269 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 7/20/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Settlement Conference set before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr., on Tuesday, July 28, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED. The parties have indicated that they are checking with a Magistrate Judge in Las Vegas for a settlement conference and will proceed accordingly. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MINUTE ORDER re In-Person Hearing - An in-person Settlement Conference will be conducted on Tuesday, July 28, 2020 at 9:00 AM (ECF No. #267 ). If you do not feel well, contact the Courtroom Deputy immediately to reschedule this hearing or make arrangements to attend it remotely. DO NOT COME TO THE COURTHOUSE IF YOU ARE EXPERIENCING FLU-LIKE SYMPTOMS. Refer to Temporary General Order 2020-02 for additional Courthouse-access policies and procedures. (See PDF image for additional details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 6/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for Tuesday, July 28, 2020 at 9:00 AM in Reno Fifth Floor Chambers before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. The Settlement Conference statements shall be received in the Clerk's Office, Room 301, not later than Tuesday, July 21, 2020 by 4:00 PM. DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 6/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 18, 2020 Filing 266 REPLY to Response to #262 Motion for Leave to File Document by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Owens, David)
May 18, 2020 Filing 265 RESPONSE to #262 Motion for Leave to File Document by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. Replies due by 5/25/2020. (Byrd, Edwin)
May 14, 2020 Filing 264 RESPONSE to #262 Motion for Leave to File Document, #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. Replies due by 5/28/2020. (Hughs, Mark)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER Denying #243 MOTION for Leave to Amend One Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 13, 2020 Filing 262 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply on Summary Judgment Motions re #257 Reply, #256 Reply by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed surreply)) (Owens, David)
May 12, 2020 Filing 261 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #260 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 11, 2020 Filing 260 ERRATA to #257 Reply by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Reply Brief) (Byrd, Edwin) Modified on 5/12/2020 add link to motion #216 (WJ).
May 11, 2020 Filing 259 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #258 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 11, 2020 Filing 258 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #235 Exhibit,, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Wang, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/11/2020 add links to motions #206 #216 . (WJ).
May 8, 2020 Filing 257 REPLY to Response to #216 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Byrd, Edwin)
May 8, 2020 Filing 256 REPLY to Response to #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hughs, Mark)
May 4, 2020 Filing 255 REPLY to Response to #243 Motion, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Owens, David)
May 1, 2020 Filing 254 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #253 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 1, 2020 Filing 253 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #248 Response by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Errata) (Byrd, Edwin) Modified on 5/1/2020 add link to motion #243 (WJ).
April 30, 2020 Filing 252 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/30/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Counsel for Defendants Ashley and Lewis have filed a letter (ECF No. #251 ) advising the Court of citation ECF No. #248 .) Pursuant to LR IC 2-2(h), the proper way to notify the Court of errors in a document is either to correct the errors in the original document and refile the document, using the "notice of corrected" image event in the "Pretrial Motions/Injunctive Relief" category or file an errata in which the corrections are identified. Counsel are directed to comply with the Local Rules requirements. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 30, 2020 Filing 251 NOTICE by Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis re #248 Response. (Byrd, Edwin)
April 30, 2020 Filing 250 REPLY to Response to #243 Motion, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Owens, David)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting ECF No. #245 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion (ECF No. #243 ) due by April 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 27, 2020 Filing 248 RESPONSE to #243 Motion, by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. Replies due by 5/4/2020. (Byrd, Edwin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 247 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #243 Motion, #246 Response by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hughs, Mark)
April 23, 2020 Filing 246 RESPONSE to #243 Motion, by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. Replies due by 4/30/2020. (Hughs, Mark)
April 23, 2020 Filing 245 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #243 Motion, by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Byrd, Edwin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 244 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #243 . Attorney David B. Owens is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 4/14/2020 COMPLIED (WJ).
April 9, 2020 Filing 243 MOTION for Leave to Amend One Answer to Former Defendant Dunlap's Requests For Admission by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Responses due by 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Responses to Ashley and Lewis RFAs, #2 Exhibit Responses to Dennison RFAs, #3 Exhibit Responses to First Dunlap RFAs, #4 Exhibit Responses to Second Dunlap RFAs, #5 Exhibit Elizabeth Wang Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4/6 Correspondence, #7 Exhibit 4/9 Correspondence) (Owens, David)
April 9, 2020 Filing 242 EXHIBIT 3 and 30 [SEALED] to #238 Response, #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #216 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 30) (Wang, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/9/2020 QC assisted attorney in sealing exhibits per 239(LE).
April 9, 2020 Filing 241 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/9/2020. Good cause appearing, Defendants' motion to extend time (ECF No. #240 ) to file replies to the motions for summary judgment (ECF Nos. #206 , #216 ) is granted. Replies are due by 5/8/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 8, 2020 Filing 240 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Defendants to file Replies re #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #216 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 239 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/7/2020. ORDER granting #234 Motion to Seal. Having found that Plaintiff meets the Ninth Circuit's compelling reasons standard to seal documents attached as Exhibits 3 and 30 to Plaintiff's Combined Response to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Seal (ECF No. 234) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file Exhibits 3 and 30 under seal on the docket. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
April 3, 2020 Filing 238 RESPONSE to #216 Motion for Summary Judgment,, #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Replies due by 4/17/2020. (Owens, David)
April 3, 2020 Filing 237 EXHIBIT List for Combined Response to to #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #216 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 63, #2 Exhibit 63, #3 Exhibit 63, #4 Exhibit 63, #5 Exhibit 63, #6 Exhibit 63, #7 Exhibit 63, #8 Exhibit 64, #9 Exhibit 65, #10 Exhibit 66, #11 Exhibit 67, #12 Exhibit 68, #13 Exhibit 69, #14 Exhibit 70) (Wang, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2020 Filing 236 EXHIBIT List for Combined Response to to #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #216 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 46, #2 Exhibit 47, #3 Exhibit 48, #4 Exhibit 49, #5 Exhibit 50, #6 Exhibit 51, #7 Exhibit 52, #8 Exhibit 53, #9 Exhibit 54, #10 Exhibit 55, #11 Exhibit 56, #12 Exhibit 57, #13 Exhibit 58, #14 Exhibit 59, #15 Exhibit 60, #16 Exhibit 61, #17 Exhibit 62) (Wang, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2020 Filing 235 EXHIBIT List for Combined Response to to #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #216 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 28, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 30, #11 Exhibit 31, #12 Exhibit 32, #13 Exhibit 33, #14 Exhibit 34, #15 Exhibit 35, #16 Exhibit 36, #17 Exhibit 37, #18 Exhibit 38, #19 Exhibit 39, #20 Exhibit 40, #21 Exhibit 41, #22 Exhibit 42, #23 Exhibit 43, #24 Exhibit 44, #25 Exhibit 45) (Wang, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2020 Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Owens, David)
April 3, 2020 Filing 233 EXHIBIT List for Combined Response to to #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #216 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20) (Wang, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2020 Filing 232 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/16/2020. Good cause appearing, Plaintiff's motion to extend time (ECF No. #231 ) to file responses to the motions for summary judgment (ECF Nos. #206 , #216 ) is granted. Responses due by 4/3/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
March 13, 2020 Filing 231 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to File Response Brief re #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #216 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Wang, Elizabeth)
February 24, 2020 Filing 230 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/24/2020. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Motion (ECF No. #229 ). Good cause appearing, the motion (ECF No. #229 ) is granted. Plaintiff may file an omnibus response to Defendants motions for summary judgment (ECF Nos. #206 and #216 ) by March 23, 2020. The response brief can consist of no more than 70 pages (not including table of contents, exhibit list and certificate of service).(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
February 21, 2020 Filing 229 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) And for Leave to File Combined Response, and Additional Pages re #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #216 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Owens, David)
February 20, 2020 Filing 228 EXHIBIT 36 to #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36 (Redacted)) (Hughs, Mark)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDERED that Defendants City of Reno and Lawrence C. Dennison's Amended Motion to Seal (ECF No. #220 ) is granted. The Joint Stipulation to Seal (ECF No. #222 ) is granted. Clerk of the Court shall strike Exhibits 2-16 and 18- 19 from ECF No. #216 and Exhibit 36 from ECF No. 215 and maintain the seal on all currently sealed exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 19, 2020 Filing 226 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #216 Motion for Summary Judgment, #224 Exhibit List,,, by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Byrd, Edwin)
February 17, 2020 Filing 224 EXHIBIT LIST to LA Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17 Filed Under Seal, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Motion for Summary Judgment with Updated Cover Page) (Byrd, Edwin) Modified on 2/18/2020 add link to motion #216 (WJ).
February 17, 2020 Filing 223 NOTICE re withdrawal of motion to file exhibits 2-16 and 18-19 under seal by Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis re #219 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,,,,,,,, #216 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Byrd, Edwin)
February 17, 2020 Filing 222 Joint STIPULATION re #219 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,,,,,,,, by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Byrd, Edwin)
February 17, 2020 Filing 221 RESPONSE to #220 Motion to Seal by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Replies due by 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Owens, David)
February 14, 2020 Filing 220 Amended MOTION to Seal #207 Motion for Leave to File Document, #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36 (Redacted)) (Hughs, Mark)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDERED that Defendants City of Reno and Lawrence C. Dennison's Motion to Seal (ECF No. #207 ) is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Donald W. Ashley and Clarence A. "Jackie" Lewis' Motion to Seal (ECF No. #217 ) is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall refile one motion per party or one stipulation to the extent the other parties do not oppose the sealing request, that lists all of the filings they request sealed, addresses the standard articulated in Ctr. for Auto Safety, and explains why that standard has been met by February 17, 2020. To the extent that the parties' request to seal is not renewed, then the Court shall unseal the documents subject to the above motions to seal on February 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 10, 2020 Filing 217 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits 1-19 Under Seal re #216 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Byrd, Edwin)
February 10, 2020 Filing 216 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. Responses due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-19 Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21, #4 Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 23, #6 Exhibit 24, #7 Exhibit 25, #8 Exhibit 26, #9 Exhibit 27, #10 Exhibit 28, #11 Exhibit 29, #12 Exhibit 30, #13 Exhibit 31, #14 Exhibit 32, #15 Exhibit 33, #16 Exhibit 34, #17 Exhibit 35) (Byrd, Edwin)
February 10, 2020 Filing 207 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal re #206 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
February 10, 2020 Filing 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. Responses due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1.39 FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36 FILED UNDER SEAL, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42) (Hughs, Mark)
February 5, 2020 Filing 205 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/5/2020. The Court is familiar with the procedural history and the allegations in this case and does not believe that excess pages are warranted. The motion to exceed page limit (ECF No. #204 ) is denied. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
February 4, 2020 Filing 204 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting ECF No. #202 Motion to Extend Time: Dispositive Motions due by 2/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
January 15, 2020 Filing 202 Third MOTION to Extend Time (Third Request) re #199 Order on Stipulation, Scheduling Order by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting ECF No. #200 Unopposed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 16, 2019 Filing 200 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wang, Elizabeth)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #198 Stipulation : Expert Discovery due by 2/1/2020. Motions due by 2/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 8, 2019 Filing 198 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re Discovery by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER that the parties' Proposed Modified Scheduling Order (ECF No. #196 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 30, 2019 Filing 196 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Byrd, Edwin)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting ECF No. #193 Stipulation of Dismissal : Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap and Washoe County are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting ECF No. #192 Stipulation : Attorney Luke Busby Substituted in the place and stead of Attorney Edmund J. Gorman, Jr., for Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/6/2019 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 193 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Defendant Calvin R.X. Dunlap. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Large, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 192 STIPULATION to Substitute Designated Resident Nevada Counsel by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 7, 2019 Filing 191 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:16-cv-00494-MMD-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting ECF No. #188 Stipulation to Conduct FRCP 35 Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 189 ADDENDUM to #188 Stipulation by Defendant Calvin R.X. Dunlap. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Large, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 188 STIPULATION to Conduct FRCP 35 Examination by Defendant Calvin R.X. Dunlap. (Large, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to ECF No. #185 Stipulation. Discovery due by 9/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting ECF No. #184 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 185 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Calvin R.X. Dunlap (Large, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #181 Scheduling Order, by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Byrd, Edwin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 183 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 167 Order on Motion for Protective Order Motion Hearing held on 3/7/2019, before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, MG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 5/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 6/3/2019. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 8/1/2019. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (MG)
April 23, 2019 Filing 182 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (LH)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to ECF No. #180 Stipulation. Discovery due by 8/29/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 18, 2019 Filing 180 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Cathy Woods and Defendants (JOINT) (Wang, Elizabeth)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER that ECF No. #171 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline is GRANTED nunc pro tunc March 22, 2019. Lewis and Ashley's Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline (ECF No. #172 ) is GRANTED. Updated discovery plan and scheduling order due by 4/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 10, 2019 Filing 178 REPLY to Response to #172 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Hearing, #2 Exhibit B - Email Exchange, #3 Exhibit C - Additional Email Exchange) (Wilkes, Zachary)
April 5, 2019 Filing 177 ANSWER to #170 Amended Complaint filed by Calvin R.X. Dunlap.(Large, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 176 ANSWER to #170 Amended Complaint filed by Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of.(Hughs, Mark)
April 3, 2019 Filing 175 RESPONSE to #172 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Replies due by 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Wang, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2019 Filing 174 JOINDER to #171 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendant Calvin R.X. Dunlap. (Large, Michael)
April 1, 2019 Filing 173 JOINDER to #172 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
March 29, 2019 Filing 172 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Conduct Discovery re #140 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings, by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Wilkes, Zachary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 171 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline re #140 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings, by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Byrd, Edwin)
March 22, 2019 Filing 170 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Donald W Ashley, Lawrence C. Dennison, Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis, Reno, City Of by Cathy Woods. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 6/20/2019.(Wang, Elizabeth)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. #147 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 7, 2019 Filing 168 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/7/2019. Having read and considered defendants City of Reno and Lawrence C. Dennison's unopposed motion to seal #162 , and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LAA)
March 7, 2019 Filing 167 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 3/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Elizabeth Wang, David Owens; Def Counsel: Mark Hughs, Michael Large; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m.; Recording start and end times: 9:32-9:54`; Courtroom: 3C; The court makes preliminary remarks and hears the representations of counsel. Plaintiff's #156 Motion for Protective Order is granted as stated on the record. The depositions of plaintiff and plaintiff's legal guardian shall be conducted in Seattle, Washington at a time to be determined by the parties. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
February 22, 2019 Filing 166 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/22/2019. Re: #156 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Cathy Woods - a telephonic hearing regarding the motion is set for March 7, 2019, at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. The parties are instructed to call telephone number: (888) 808-6929, access code: 8129639, five minutes prior to the hearing time. The Court will join the call and convene the proceedings. The call must be made on a land line. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
February 18, 2019 Filing 165 REPLY to Response to #156 Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Owens, David)
February 12, 2019 Filing 163 RESPONSE to #156 Motion for Protective Order by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. Replies due by 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6) (Hughs, Mark)
February 12, 2019 Filing 162 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal re #156 Motion for Protective Order by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 161 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/11/2019. ORDER granting #160 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Motion for Protective Order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LAA)
February 8, 2019 Filing 160 MOTION to supplement motion for protective order re #156 Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Responses due by 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Gunderson Declaration), #2 Exhibit 2 (Clingaman Letter 2-8-19)) (Wang, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2019 Filing 159 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Zachary A. Wilkes is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
February 1, 2019 Filing 158 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/1/2019. Re: #156 Emergency Motion for Protective Order. The court reviewed the motion and determined it will not be addressed on an emergency basis. Responses and replies are due in the ordinary course. The depositions at issue are STAYED pending the court's order on the motion. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LAA)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for leave to depose inmate RODNEY HALBOWER ECF No. #154 , via stenography and videography, is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/1/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 1, 2019 Filing 156 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Owens, David)
January 31, 2019 Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, #135 Miscellaneous Hearing,, held on 6-13-18, before Valerie P cooke. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, KF@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 2/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 3/3/2019. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 5/1/2019. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (KF)
January 31, 2019 Filing 154 Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition from Rodney Halbower , Incarcerated Witness by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Responses due by 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Owens, David)
January 31, 2019 Filing 153 REPLY to Response to #147 Motion to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Affidavit in Support of Complaint and Arrest Warrant), #2 Exhibit 2 (Dennison testimony), #3 Exhibit 3 (Dunlap brief), #4 Exhibit 4 (Dennison Dep.), #5 Exhibit 5 (Dunlap statements)) (Wang, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2019 Filing 152 RESPONSE to #147 Motion to Amend/Correct by Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. Replies due by 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Large, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 151 RESPONSE to #147 Motion to Amend/Correct by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. Replies due by 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hughs, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Filing 150 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Zachary A. Wilkes is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER approving ECF No. #148 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Zachary A. Wilkes on behalf of Donald W. Ashley & Clarence A. "Jackie" Lewis and approving Designation of Local Counsel Katherine F. Parks. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/17/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 17, 2019 Filing 148 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Zachary A. Wilkes, on behalf of Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis, and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Katherine F. Parks (Filing fee $ 250 PAID NVRNO004424). (KW)
January 14, 2019 Filing 147 MOTION to Amend/Correct #67 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Responses due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Third Amended Complaint))(Wang, Elizabeth)
December 11, 2018 Filing 146 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Wang, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Large. (Large, Michael)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER re ECF No. #143 Joint Status Report. Given that there are not any pending discovery motions, the court will vacate the upcoming case-management conferences that were scheduled by Magistrate Judge Cooke. The parties must meet and confer and file a joint status report in 90 days. Should discovery disputes arise in the meantime, the parties may file a joint request for a telephonic status conference that briefly outlines the nature of the discovery dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 7, 2018 Filing 143 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiff Cathy Woods (Owens, David)
August 28, 2018 Filing 142 CLERK'S NOTICE - Due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, this action will be reassigned to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman for all further pretrial proceedings within his jurisdiction. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:16-cv-494-MMD-CWH. (no image attached) (no image attached) (BLG)
August 8, 2018 Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/8/2018. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. The case management conference currently set for Friday, August 10, 2018 at 10:00 AM is VACATED. The parties are directed to file a joint case management report by no later than the close of business on Friday, September 7, 2018, which provides a case summary for the new Magistrate Judge that will be assigned to this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to ECF No. #139 Proposed Modified Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 20, 2018 Filing 139 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Cathy Woods (Joint Motion to Modify Discovery Plan) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Modified Discovery Plan)) (Wang, Elizabeth)
July 13, 2018 Filing 138 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 7/13/2018 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Elizabeth Wang (By telephone); Def Counsel: Mark Hughs, Michael Large, Jennifer Gustafson, Katherine Parks, and (By telephone) Edwin Byrd; Recording start and end times: 10:02:36 - 10:43:51; Courtroom: 1; The Court and counsel discuss the issues as outlined in the parties' supplemental case management report (ECF No. #137 ). See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
July 9, 2018 Filing 137 Joint STATUS REPORT for July 2018 by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Pl.'s Supp. Resp. to Ashley & Lewis's Interrogs.), #2 Exhibit 2 (Ashley & Lewis's Resp. to Pl.'s First Interrogs.), #3 Exhibit 3 (Pl.'s Supp. Resp. to Dunlap's Interrogs.), #4 Exhibit 4 (Dunlap's Resp. to Pl.'s First and Second Interrogs.)) (Wang, Elizabeth)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER that Defendant Calvin Dunlap's Motion to Certify Question to Nevada Supreme Court ECF No. #102 is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/3/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 13, 2018 Filing 135 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 6/13/2018 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: David Owens (By telephone); Def Counsel: Mark Hughs, Michael Large, Jennifer Gustafson, Katherine Parks, and (By telephone) Edwin Byrd; Recording start and end times: 10:11:10 - 10:22:41; Courtroom: 1; The Court and counsel discuss the parties' supplemental case management report (ECF No. #133 ). See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
June 13, 2018 Filing 134 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/13/2018. Please take notice that Judge Du has made changes to her Civil Standing Order. The most current Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
June 8, 2018 Filing 133 Supplemental CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT for June 2018 by Plaintiff Cathy Woods (Wang, Elizabeth)
May 29, 2018 Filing 132 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/29/2018. The motion to quash (ECF No. #129 ) is DENIED as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 23, 2018 Filing 131 RESPONSE to #129 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Replies due by 5/30/2018. (Wang, Elizabeth)
May 15, 2018 Filing 130 DECLARATION re #129 Motion to Strike by Movants Nickie Basinger, Oregon Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Robert E. Sullivan) (Sullivan, Robert)
May 15, 2018 Filing 129 MOTION to Quash Strike by Movants Oregon Department of Corrections, Nickie Basinger. Responses due by 5/29/2018. (Sullivan, Robert) Modified on 5/23/2018 correct title. (WJ).
May 4, 2018 Filing 128 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 5/4/2018 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Elizabeth Wang (By telephone); Def Counsel: Mark Hughs, Katherine Parks, Michael Large and Jennifer Gustafson; Recording start and end times: 10:02:32 - 10:28:17; Courtroom: 1; The Court and counsel discuss the issues outlined in the parties' supplemental case management report (ECF No. #127 ). The City of Reno shall provide supplemental production and responses by no later than May 31, 2018. Ms. Gustafson shall provide the supplemental information regarding Mr. Dunlap's privilege log requested by Ms. Wang by no later than May 9, 2018. The privilege log from the Attorney General's Office concerning Bill Cooper shall be completed by no later than June 4, 2018. The Court directs Ms. Gustafson to provide a copy of this order to Ms. Sage and her supervisor. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
May 1, 2018 Filing 127 Supplemental CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT for May 2018 by Plaintiff Cathy Woods (Wang, Elizabeth)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER that Fairfax Behavioral Health produce documents as outlined in order (see order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 24, 2018 Filing 124 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Wang, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2018 Filing 123 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Wang, Elizabeth)
April 5, 2018 Filing 122 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 4/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Elizabeth Wang and David Owens (Both by telephone); Def Counsel: Mark Hughs, Jennifer Gustafson, Michael Large and (By telephone) Edwin Byrd, III; Recording start and end times: 10:02:06 - 10:54:42; Courtroom: 1; The Court and counsel discuss the parties' second supplemental case management report (ECF No. #121 ). Mr. Hughs advises he will provide the list of records to Ms. Wang by no later than Friday, April 20, 2018. Ms. Gustafson shall produce the privilege log concerning Mr. Dunlap by no later than Friday, April 20, 2018. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
March 30, 2018 Filing 121 Supplemental CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT (April 2018) by Plaintiff Cathy Woods (Wang, Elizabeth)
March 30, 2018 Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/30/2018. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. Out-of-state counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for the case management conferences set in this case unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Counsel appearing telephonically shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to each hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 16494. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
March 22, 2018 Filing 119 Supplemental CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT regarding deposition schedule by Plaintiff Cathy Woods (Wang, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE of Proposed Protective Order by Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of re #114 Miscellaneous Hearing,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hughs, Mark)
March 14, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Plaintiff's Proposed Protective Order), #2 Exhibit 2 (Emails from Large and Byrd), #3 Exhibit 3 (Emails between Hughs and Wang), #4 Exhibit 4 (Reno Defendants' Proposed Protective Order), #5 Exhibit 5 (Declaration of Wang)) (Wang, Elizabeth)
March 9, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (KW)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to ECF No. #109 Case Management Report. Discovery due by 11/15/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 12/17/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 8, 2018 Filing 114 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 3/8/2018 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Elizabeth Wang (By telephone); Def Counsel: Mark Hughs, Michael Large, Jennifer Gustafson, Katherine Parks, and (By telephone) Edwin Byrd, III; Recording start and end times: 10:01:47 - 10:51:21; Courtroom: 1; The Court approves the parties' proposed discovery plan and scheduling order as outlined in the parties' joint case management report (ECF No. #109 ). The Court advises it will set monthly case management conferences in this case through the close of discovery. Counsel shall file a proposed protective order by no later than Thursday, March 15, 2018. The deputy court clerk is directed to attach a standard protective order to the minutes of this proceeding. Counsel shall file a supplemental case management report advising the Court of the deposition schedule by no later than Thursday, March 22, 2018. THEREAFTER, the deputy court clerk and counsel scheduling monthly case management conferences as follows: 4/5/2018 at 10:00 AM, 5/4/2018 at 10:00 AM, 6/13/2018 at 10:00 AM, 7/13/2018 at 10:00 AM, 8/10/2018 at 10:00 AM, 9/13/2018 at 10:00 AM, 10/10/2018 at 10:00 AM, and 11/2/2018 at 10:00 AM all in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Counsel shall file a joint or separate case management report four (4) court days prior to each case management conference. See the attached order for specifications. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
February 26, 2018 Filing 113 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/26/2018. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A case management conference is set for 3/8/2018 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Any supplements to the joint case management report (ECF No. #109 ) shall be filed by no later than the close of business on Tuesday, March 6, 2018. Out-of-state counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for this conference and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 16494. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
February 16, 2018 Filing 112 REPLY to Response to #102 Motion by Defendant Calvin R.X. Dunlap. (Large, Michael)
February 12, 2018 Filing 111 RESPONSE to #102 Motion by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Replies due by 2/19/2018. (Wang, Elizabeth)
February 9, 2018 Filing 110 ANSWER to #67 Amended Complaint, filed by Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis.(Byrd, Edwin)
February 8, 2018 Filing 109 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiff Cathy Woods (Wang, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting ECF No. #104 Stipulation of Time to Response to ECF No. #67 Second Amended Complaint. Defendants' answer/response due 2/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 5, 2018 Filing 107 ANSWER to #67 Amended Complaint, filed by Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of.(Hughs, Mark)
February 2, 2018 Filing 106 Amended ANSWER to #67 Amended Complaint, for Calvin R.X. Dunlap filed by Washoe, County Of.(Large, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 105 ANSWER to #67 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses on Behalf of Calvin R.X. Dunlap filed by Calvin R.X. Dunlap.(Large, Michael)
February 1, 2018 Filing 104 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to file responsive pleadings to second amended complaint by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Byrd, Edwin)
January 30, 2018 Filing 103 JOINDER to #102 Motion by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
January 29, 2018 Filing 102 MOTION District Judge to Certify Question by Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. Responses due by 2/12/2018. (Large, Michael)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER that ECF No. #72 Defendants Ashley and Lewis's Motion to Dismiss is denied; ECF Nos. #70 Defendants Calvin Dunlap and Washoe County's Motion to Dismiss and #73 Defendants City of Reno and Dennison's Motion to Dismiss are granted in part and denied in part; Washoe County is dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 19, 2017 Filing 100 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 9/19/2017 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: David Owens (By telephone); Def Counsel: Mark Hughs, Michael Large, Katherine Parks, and (By telephone) Edwin Byrd; Recording start and end times: 2:01:38 - 2:46:47; Courtroom: 1; The Court advises counsel it intended to convey that plaintiff's motion to commence discovery or, in the alternative, conduct limited discovery (ECF No. #87 ) was GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as more fully set forth on the record by the Court at the July 28, 2017, motions hearing. The Court finds its order staying discovery stands and that discovery in this case is STAYED. The Court further states the only formal discovery to proceed is the deposition of plaintiff's mother which shall occur on or before November 20, 2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
September 13, 2017 Filing 99 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Owens, David)
September 13, 2017 Filing 98 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. (Large, Michael)
August 24, 2017 Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 8/24/2017. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. In light of a conflict with the Court's calendar, the case management conference currently set for 9/19/2017 shall commence at 02:00 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke instead of 10:00 AM as originally scheduled. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
July 28, 2017 Filing 96 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motions Hearing held on 7/28/2017 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: David Owens; Def Counsel: Mark Hughs, Edwin Byrd, Katherine Parks, Michael Large, and Jennifer Gustafson; Recording start and end times: 2:01:57 - 3:19:05; Courtroom: 1; The Court orders limited discovery pending disposition of the motions to dismiss. The deputy court clerk is directed to attach a copy of a standard protective order to the minutes of this proceeding. Plaintiff's counsel shall provide plaintiff's initial disclosures to defendants' counsel pursuant to Rule 26 by no later than Monday, August 28, 2017. A case management conference is set for 9/19/2017 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. The parties shall file a joint or separate case management report by no later than the close of business on Wednesday, September 13, 2017. See the attached order for specifications. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
July 6, 2017 Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 7/6/2017. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A motions hearing regarding defendant Donald W. Ashley and defendant Clarence A. "Jackie" Lewis's motion to stay discovery pending ruling on personal jurisdiction (ECF No. #86 ) and plaintiff's motion to commence discovery or, in the alternative, conduct limited discovery (ECF No. #87 ) is set for 7/28/2017 at 02:00 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Out-of-state counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for this hearing and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 16494. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) Modified on 7/6/2017 to include call-in information. (LGM)
June 29, 2017 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #94 Brief, : QC made necessary corrections to the docket. Filer used wrong even type: reply to a motion is found under Motions and Other Related Filings; and failed to comply with LR IC 2-2(d) by linking his document to Motion #87 . (no image attached)(WJ)
June 29, 2017 Filing 94 REPLY BRIEF re #93 Response to Motion, ; filed by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. Reply Brief in Further Support of Maintaining the Discovery Stay (Byrd, Edwin) Modified on 6/29/2017 correct title of document. (WJ). Modified on 6/29/2017 add link to #87 (WJ).
June 26, 2017 Filing 93 RESPONSE to #87 Motion to Lift Stay, filed by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. Defendant Ashley abnd Lewis's opposition to plaintiff's motion to lift discovery stay Replies due by 7/3/2017. (Byrd, Edwin)
June 23, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE by Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
June 23, 2017 Filing 91 JOINDER to #86 Motion to Stay, #88 Opposition to Plaintiff's #87 Motion to Commence Discovery ; filed by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark) Modified on 6/23/2017 add link to #88 and #87 (WJ).
June 23, 2017 Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, #63 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,,,, Miscellaneous Hearing,,,, Motion Hearing,,, held on 11-30-16, before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, KF@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 7/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 7/24/2017. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 9/21/2017. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (KF)
June 22, 2017 Filing 89 RESPONSE to #86 Motion to Stay, filed by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Replies due by 6/29/2017. (Owens, David)
June 20, 2017 Filing 88 JOINDER to #86 Motion to Stay ; and Oppositon to Plaintiff's #87 Motion to Commence Discovery filed by Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. (Large, Michael) Modified on 6/23/2017 add link to motion #87 (WJ).
June 12, 2017 Filing 87 MOTION to Lift Stay re #86 Motion to Stay, #63 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,,,, Miscellaneous Hearing,,,, Motion Hearing,,, by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Owens, David)
June 12, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Personal Jurisdiction by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Byrd, Edwin)
June 8, 2017 Filing 85 REPLY to Response to #72 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Byrd, Edwin)
June 8, 2017 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to #73 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
June 8, 2017 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to #70 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. Reply in Support of Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap and Washoe County's Motion to Dismiss (Gustafson, Jennifer)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting ECF No. #81 Stipulation to File Replies in Support Defendants' Mtoin to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ECF Nos. #73 Motion to Dismiss and #72 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Replies due by 6/8/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 05/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 31, 2017 Filing 81 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) Stipulation to Extend Time to File Replies in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. (Gustafson, Jennifer)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER approving ECF No. #79 Stipulation re ECF Nos. #70 , #72 , and #73 Motions to Dismiss: Replies due by 6/1/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 22, 2017 Filing 79 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #70 Motion to Dismiss, #73 Motion to Dismiss, #72 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction ; by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
May 18, 2017 Filing 78 RESPONSE to #72 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Replies due by 5/25/2017. (Owens, David)
May 18, 2017 Filing 77 RESPONSE to #73 Motion to Dismiss, #70 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Replies due by 5/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (jury instructions), #2 Exhibit B (general verdict), #3 Exhibit C (Hall complaint))(Wang, Elizabeth)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting ECF No. #75 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To File Response To Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. The responses for the following motions are due by 5/18/2017: (1) ECF No. #70 , Motion to Dismiss, filed by Washoe County Defendants; (2) ECF No. #72 , Motion to Dismiss, filed by defendants Ashley and Lewis; (3) ECF No. #73 , Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed City of Reno defendants. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
May 5, 2017 Filing 75 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To File Response To Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Owens, David)
May 1, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer L. Gustafson on behalf of Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. (Gustafson, Jennifer)
April 28, 2017 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss re #67 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. Responses due by 5/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Hughs, Mark)
April 28, 2017 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. Responses due by 5/12/2017. (Byrd, Edwin)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AMENDED ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to for leave to file second amended complaint (ECF No. #39 ) is granted. Defendants' motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. #28 , #31 , #32 ) and motion to file excess page (ECF No. #42 ) are denied as moot. The stipulation for extension of time (ECF No. #49 ) is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 24, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. Responses due by 5/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Large, Michael)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER approving ECF No. #68 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint ECF No. #67 . Defendants' answer/response due 4/28/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 04/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 20, 2017 Filing 68 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #67 Amended Complaint, ; by Defendant Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
April 10, 2017 Filing 67 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) with Jury Demand against Donald W Ashley, Lawrence C. Dennison, Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis, Reno, City Of, Washoe, County Of, filed by Cathy Woods. Removes parties. Proof of service due by 7/9/2017.(Wang, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to for leave to file second amended complaint (ECF No. #39 ) is granted. Defendants' motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. #28 , #31 , #32 ) and motion to file excess page (ECF No. #39 ) are denied as moot. The stipulation for extension of time (ECF No. #49 ) is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 4/4/2017 to add hyperlink (DRM).
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Pursuant to FRCP 4(m). IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice as to John L Kimpton. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 04/04/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 24, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The Complaint in this action was filed on 08/22/16. To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to John L. Kimpton. FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 3/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG)
November 30, 2016 Filing 63 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference/Motions Hearing held on 11/30/2016 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Elizabeth Wang and Edmund Gorman; Def Counsel: Mark Hughs, Michael Large, and Edwin Byrd; Recording start and end times: 9:03:32 - 9:58:20 and 10:11:21 - 10:55:14; Courtroom: 1; The defendants City of Reno and Lawrence Dennison's motion to stay (ECF No. #34 ), defendants Washoe County and Calvin Dunlap's joinder in motion to stay (ECF No. #35 ), and defendants Donald Ashley and Clarence Lewis's motion to stay discovery (ECF No. #53 ) are GRANTED. Therefore, discovery is STAYED pending a ruling on the defendants' motions to dismiss by the District Court. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
November 23, 2016 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis re #53 Motion to Stay. Reply in Further Support of Motion to Stay Discovery (Byrd, Edwin)
November 22, 2016 Filing 61 Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Wang, Elizabeth)
November 18, 2016 Filing 60 RESPONSE to #53 Motion to Stay, filed by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. with Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Replies due by 11/28/2016. (Wang, Elizabeth)
November 17, 2016 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to #39 Motion for Leave to File filed by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Owens, David)
November 17, 2016 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to #31 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. (Large, Michael)
November 17, 2016 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to #32 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hughs, Mark)
November 14, 2016 Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 11/14/2016. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. Counsel are advised that the Court will hear argument on defendants' motion to stay discovery (ECF No. #53 ) at the case management conference/motions hearing set for 11/30/2016 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Plaintiff shall have until 4:00 PM on Friday, November 18, 2016 to file an opposition and defendants shall have until noon on Wednesday, November 23, 2016 to file a reply. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
November 14, 2016 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Byrd, Edwin)
November 10, 2016 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to #34 Motion to Stay filed by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
November 10, 2016 Filing 53 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. (Byrd, Edwin)
November 10, 2016 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis re #39 Motion for Leave to File. Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Byrd, Edwin)
November 10, 2016 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to #34 Motion to Stay filed by Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. Reply to Joinder to Motion to Stay Discovery (Large, Michael)
November 8, 2016 Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 11/8/2016. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. Counsel are advised the Court will hear oral argument on defendants City of Reno and Lawrence Dennison's motion to stay discovery (ECF No. #34 ) and defendants Washoe County and Calvin Dunlap's joinder in motion to stay discovery (ECF No. #35 ) at the case management conference set before this Court on Wednesday, November 30, 2016 at 09:00 AM. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
November 7, 2016 Filing 49 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #31 Motion to Dismiss,, #32 Motion to Dismiss,, ; by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
November 2, 2016 Filing 48 RESPONSE to #32 Motion to Dismiss,, #31 Motion to Dismiss,,, filed by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. with Memorandum of Points and Authorities Replies due by 11/12/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wang, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2016 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to #39 Motion for Leave to File filed by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Owens, David)
October 31, 2016 Filing 46 RESPONSE to #35 Joinder, in Opposition to Washoe Defendants' Joinder in Motion to Stay filed by Reno Defendants filed by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Wang, Elizabeth)
October 31, 2016 Filing 45 RESPONSE to #34 Motion to Stay, filed by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Replies due by 11/10/2016. (Wang, Elizabeth)
October 31, 2016 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #39 Motion for Leave to File, filed by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. Replies due by 11/10/2016. (Hughs, Mark)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting ECF No. #41 Motion for Leave to File Combined Response to Washoe and Reno Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 27, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re #31 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. (Large, Michael)
October 27, 2016 Filing 41 MOTION Leave to File Combined Response to Washoe and Reno Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Responses due by 11/13/2016. (Wang, Elizabeth)
October 27, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. Re Douglas Matthew Burks (Owens, David)
October 27, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Owens, David)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting ECF No. #37 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to the Rule 12(b)(2) Motions to Dismiss of Defendants Washoe County, Calvin R. X. Dunlap, City of Reno, and Lawrence Dennison. Responses due by 11/2/2016. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 26, 2016 Filing 37 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #31 Motion to Dismiss,, #32 Motion to Dismiss,, ; to November 2, 2016 to file Response to Motions to Dismiss by Washoe Defendants and Reno Defendants by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Wang, Elizabeth)
October 19, 2016 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 10/19/2016. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A case management conference is set for 11/30/2016 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Out-of-state counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for this hearing and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 16494. The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Friday, November 18, 2016. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
October 18, 2016 Filing 35 JOINDER to #34 Motion to Stay ; filed by Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. (Large, Michael)
October 17, 2016 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
October 14, 2016 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Hughs, Mark)
October 14, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. Responses due by 10/31/2016. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Hughs, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 13, 2016 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Washoe, County Of. Responses due by 10/30/2016. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Large, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting ECF No. #29 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to ECF No. #28 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/7/2016. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 11, 2016 Filing 29 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #28 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, ; to November 7, 2016 to file response brief by Plaintiff Cathy Woods. (Wang, Elizabeth)
October 3, 2016 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Donald W Ashley, Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis. Responses due by 10/20/2016. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Donald Ashley, #2 Affidavit Jackie Lewis)(Byrd, Edwin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 27, 2016 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy Woods. Douglas Matthew Burks served on 9/13/2016, answer due 10/14/2016. (Wang, Elizabeth)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #23 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph S. Woodley for Donald Ashley and Clarence A. "Jackie" Lewis; and approving Designation of Local Counsel Katherine F. Parks. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/21/2016. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #24 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Edwin H. Byrd, III for Donald Ashley and Clarence A. "Jackie" Lewis; and approving Designation of Local Counsel Katherine F. Parks. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/21/2016. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 21, 2016 Filing 24 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Edwin H. Byrd III for Donald Ashley and Clarence A. "Jackie" Lewis, and designation of Local Counsel Katherine F. Parks (Filing fee $250 - PAID, receipt NVRNO-3413). (KR)
September 21, 2016 Filing 23 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joseph S. Woodley for Donald Ashley and Clarence A. "Jackie" Lewis, and designation of Local Counsel Katherine F. Parks (Filing fee $250 - PAID, receipt NVRNO-3413). (KR)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting ECF No. #21 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer First Amended Complaint (First Request). Answer/Response to First Amended Complaint due by 10/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 09/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 12, 2016 Filing 21 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #20 Amended Complaint ; by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
September 8, 2016 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Cathy Woods. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 12/7/2016.(Wang, Elizabeth)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on #18 STIPULATION : Defendants City of Reno, Lawrence Dennison, Washoe County, and Calvin R.X. Dunlap's Answer/response to ECF No. #1 Complaint due 10/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 9/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 7, 2016 Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, ; by Defendants Lawrence C. Dennison, Reno, City Of. (Hughs, Mark)
August 30, 2016 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy Woods re #1 Complaint,,. Donald W Ashley served on 8/26/2016, answer due 9/16/2016. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 30, 2016 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy Woods re #1 Complaint,,. Washoe, County Of served on 8/25/2016, answer due 9/15/2016. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 30, 2016 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy Woods re #1 Complaint,,. Reno, City Of served on 8/24/2016, answer due 9/14/2016. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 30, 2016 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy Woods re #1 Complaint,,. Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis served on 8/25/2016, answer due 9/15/2016. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 30, 2016 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy Woods re #1 Complaint,,. Calvin R.X. Dunlap served on 8/24/2016, answer due 9/14/2016. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 30, 2016 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy Woods re #1 Complaint,,. Lawrence C. Dennison served on 8/26/2016, answer due 9/16/2016. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 30, 2016 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy Woods re #1 Complaint,,. Donald W Ashley served on 8/24/2016, answer due 9/14/2016. (Wang, Elizabeth)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Approved ECF No. #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David B. Owens for Cathy Woods (a/k/a Anita Carter) and approving Designation of Local Counsel Edmund J. Gorman, Jr. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/26/2016. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Approved ECF No. #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Elizabeth C. Wang for Cathy Woods (a/k/a Anita Carter) and approving Designation of Local Counsel Edmund J. Gorman, Jr. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/26/2016. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 26, 2016 Filing 8 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David B. Owens and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Edmund J. Gorman, Jr. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4258125) filed by Plaintiff Cathy Woods . (Gorman, Edmund)
August 26, 2016 Filing 7 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth C. Wang and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Edmund J. Gorman, Jr. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4258034) filed by Plaintiff Cathy Woods . (Gorman, Edmund) Modified on 8/29/2016 to correct spelling of Ms. Wang's name (PAV).
August 23, 2016 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 8/23/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
August 23, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Donald W. Ashley, Douglas Matthew Burks, Lawrence C. Dennison, Calvin R.X. Dunlap, Clarence A. "Jackie" Lewis, City of Reno, County of Washoe, re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (KR)
August 22, 2016 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Cathy Woods. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Gorman, Edmund)
August 22, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David B. Owens to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 10/6/2016. (no image attached) (WJ)
August 22, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Elizabeth Wang to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 10/6/2016. (no image attached) (WJ)
August 22, 2016 Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. (WJ)
August 22, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4250487), filed by Cathy Woods. Proof of service due by 11/20/2016. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Donald Ashley, #3 Summons Matthew Burks, #4 Summons Lawrence Dennison, #5 Summons Calvin Dunlap, #6 Summons Clarence Lewis, #7 Summons City of Reno, #8 Summons Washoe County)(Gorman, Edmund) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods vs City of Reno, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Woods
Represented By: David Benjamin Owens
Represented By: Edmund J. Gorman, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Luke Andrew Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Carter
Represented By: David Benjamin Owens
Represented By: Edmund J. Gorman, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Represented By: Luke Andrew Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Reno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence A. "Jackie Lewis
Represented By: Edwin H. Byrd, III
Represented By: Joseph S. Woodley
Represented By: Katherine F. Parks
Represented By: Zachary Alexander Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence C. Dennison
Represented By: Mark A. Hughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washoe, County Of
Represented By: Jennifer L. Gustafson
Represented By: Michael Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L Kimpton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W Ashley
Represented By: Edwin H. Byrd, III
Represented By: Joseph S. Woodley
Represented By: Katherine F. Parks
Represented By: Zachary Alexander Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin R.X. Dunlap
Represented By: Jennifer L. Gustafson
Represented By: Michael Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno, City Of
Represented By: Mark A. Hughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Matthew Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oregon Department of Corrections
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Recordkeeper Nickie Basinger
Represented By: Robert E. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?