Excedis Corporation vs Edward Bollmann, et al
Plaintiff: Excedis Corporation
Defendant: Edward Bollman and James Kerr
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Edward Bollman and James Kerr
Counter Claimant: Edward Bollman and James Kerr
Counter Defendant: Excedis Corporation
ThirdParty Defendant: Jean Hogan, Patrick Hogan, Catherine Mead and Thomas Ripley
Case Number: 3:2016cv00514
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER that the request to withdraw filed by counsel for Bollman and Kerr is hereby GRANTED; the Clerk shall update the docket to reflect that Bollman and Kerr are now proceeding pro se; all notices in this action shall be sent to Bollman and K err at their last known addresses; Bollman and Kerr shall have until November 16, 2020, to either obtain substitute counsel or file a case status report. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/16/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER re ECF No. 140 Case Status Report, directing Counsel, no later than 9/14/2020, to mail a copy of this order to Bollman and Kerr at their last known address and to provide the Court with Bollman and Kerr's contact information.Counsel's request to withdraw will be granted unless, on or before 10/5/2020, Bollman and/or Kerr file a notice objecting to the withdrawal. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 AMENDED ORDER that the Court's prior Order ECF No. 120 is amended to reflect that Excedis' Complaint ECF No. 1 , Ex. 1 is DISMISSED without prejudice and Excedis' Answer ECF No. 22 is STRICKEN; Bollamn-Kerr counterclaim ECF No. 7 has not been stricken; Clerk is directed to amend the docket accordingly. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER that the court accepts the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 116 ) in whole; Excedis' complaint (ECF No. 1 , Ex. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice; and Excedis' answer to the Bollman-Kerr counterclaim (ECF No. 7 ) is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDERED that the court awards cost sanctions in favor of Bollman and Kerr and against Third Party Defendant Thomas Ripley in the amount of $6,307.44. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Re: ECF Nos. 104 Motion to Compel, 106 Motion for "Cost Sanctions" : Counsel for Bollman and Kerr shall submit a declaration by 7/19/2018 itemizing the expenses, costs and fees incurred by reason of the motion to compel. (See pdf order for specifics.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER that Courtroom Administrator to set a hearing on ECF No. 107 Motion to Extend Time; docket to reflect 3rd Party Defendants Ripley, patrick and Jean Hogan and Catherine Mead as proceeding pro se, add mailing address and serve order on same. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER pursuant to ECF No. 92 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Counsel : Excedis Corporation to secure and retain counsel by 6/8/2018; case deadlines pursuant to ECF No. 91 Order to remain intact; Clerk directed to electronically serve this order upon Plaintiff Excedis and Third Party Defendants Thomas Hogan, Patrick Hogan, Jean Hogan and Catherine Mead; Attorney Stallard is directed to serve this Order upon Third Party Defendant Thomas Ripley. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Adam P. McMillen withdrawn from the case on behalf of Plaintiff Excedis Corporation. Plaintiff Excedis Corporation shall file a substitution of counsel on or before Thursday, Octobe r 20, 2016. The failure to find replacement counsel will likely result in a dismissal of the Excedis action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this order and all documents filed until Plaintiff obtains counsel shall be served on Excedis Cor poration, via regular mail at the following address: Excedis Corporation 4950 Wedekind Road, Suite 2 Sparks, Nevada 89703-4290 Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/20/2016. (Order mailed to Excedis to specified address on 9/20/2016.)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Excedis Corporation vs Edward Bollmann, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Edward Bollman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: James Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Edward Bollman
Represented By: Travis N Barrick
Represented By: Coit Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: James Kerr
Represented By: Travis N Barrick
Represented By: Coit Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Bollman
Represented By: Travis N Barrick
Represented By: Coit Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kerr
Represented By: Travis N Barrick
Represented By: Coit Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Excedis Corporation
Represented By: Adam P. McMillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Excedis Corporation
Represented By: Adam P. McMillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Jean Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Patrick Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Catherine Mead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Thomas Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?