Robert L. Citroen, Law Corporation v. Micron Optics, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Robert L. Citroen, Law Corporation |
Defendant: |
Micron Optics, Inc. |
Counter Defendant: |
Robert L. Citroen and Robert L. Citroen, Law Corporation |
Counter Claimant: |
Micron Optics, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00570 |
Filed: |
October 3, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 29, 2018 |
Filing
92
ORDER granting ECF No. 91 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Filing Joint Pretrial Order (First Request). Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
May 17, 2018 |
Filing
90
ORDER that the Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 73 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; the Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 76 ) is DENIED; and Clerk shall correct the docket to reflect that ECF No. 77 is not a motion. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
February 6, 2018 |
Filing
84
ORDER granting ECF No. 83 Stipulation for Extension of Time to file replies to ECF Nos. 73 , 76 , and 77 Motions for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 2/8/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
December 21, 2017 |
Filing
80
ORDER granting ECF No. 79 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF Nos. 73 , 76 , and 77 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due 1/11/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
November 7, 2017 |
Filing
72
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
October 3, 2017 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting Defendant's request for fees incurred in connection with its Motion to Compel 42 . ROBERT L. CITROEN, LAW CORPORATION and ROBERT L. CITROEN are ordered to pay Micron $5,831.85 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
August 28, 2017 |
Filing
52
ORDER that Microns Motion to Compel ECF No. 42 is GRANTED. Micron's request for reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred in connectionwith this motion is granted. Micron shall file a document setting forth the reasonable expenses requested on or before 09/08/2017. Citroen has until 09/20/2017 to file a response. Micron will then have until 09/27/2017, to file a reply, if necessary. See Order for further details and information. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 08/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
May 24, 2017 |
Filing
37
ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
February 17, 2017 |
Filing
29
ORDER denying ECF No. 13 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?