Polk v. Carpenter et al
Plaintiff: |
Renard T Polk |
Defendant: |
Renee Baker, Dwayne Baze, Kelly Belanger, Quentin Byrne, Tara Carpenter, William Moore and Ranaldo Waldo |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00652 |
Filed: |
November 9, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Valerie P. Cooke |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 12, 2020 |
Filing
126
ORDER - The Clerk shall ISSUE a summons for Ranaldo Waldo and send the same to the USM with the address provided under seal (ECF No. 28 ). Clerk shall also SEND a copy of the Complaint (ECF No. 16 ), the screening orders (ECF No. 15 and [1 7]), and a copy of this order to the USM for service on the Defendant (Copies delivered to USM on 2/12/2020).Clerk shall SEND to Plaintiff one USM-285 form (Attached hereto for distribution to Plaintiff by LCC). Plaintiff shall have until < B>Wednesday, February 26, 2020, to complete the USM-285 service form and return it to the USM, 400 South Virginia Street, 2nd Floor, Reno NV 89501.Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/12/2020. (Attachments: # 1 USM-285 Form)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
February 10, 2020 |
Filing
125
ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for Clerk's entry of default (ECF No. 94 ) is denied. Defendant James Donnelly;s motion to dismiss (ECF No. 97 ) is denied. Plaintiff has until April 17, 2020, to serve Defendant Waldo. Failure to file proof of service by April 17, 2020, will result in dismissal of Waldo under Rule 4(m). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
October 21, 2019 |
Filing
116
ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARLA B. CARRY - The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Carla B. Carry (ECF No. 93 ) is accepted and adopted in full. Plaintiff's Objections (ECF No. 98 ) are overruled. Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 63 ) is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
October 3, 2019 |
Filing
110
ORDER granting ECF No. 109 Motion to Extend Time re ECF No. 101 Response to ECF No. 97 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 19, 2019 |
Filing
92
ORDER - The motion to compel and the motion request for subpoenas duces tecum (ECF Nos. 83 & 84 ) are DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for enlargement of time (ECF No. 87 ) is DENIED. Defendant's motion for extension of time (ECF No. 85 ) is DENIED. Dispositive motions remain due by Monday, September 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 8/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 14, 2019 |
Filing
62
ORDER accepting and adopting in full ECF No. 52 Report and Recommendation; denying Defendants' 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; overruling Defendants' ECF No. 60 Objection. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
February 15, 2018 |
Filing
25
ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 8 IFP application - NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); directing Clerk to e-serve this order and ECF No. 16 Complaint on NV AG (N EFs sent 2/16/2018); directing service to be perfected within 90 days; directing AG to advise Court within 21 days re service. Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff to serve defendants copies of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 10, 2017 |
Filing
12
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 8/10/2017, granting in part Plaintiff's ECF No. 6 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing ECF No. 4 Motion to Vacate. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?