Bank of America, N.A. v. Highland Ranch Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Highland Ranch Homeowners Association, LVDG LLC Series 114 and Thunder Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00655
Filed: November 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting ECF No. 63 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting ECF No. 60 Stipulation for Dismissal of Highland Ranch Homeowners Association with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting ECF No. 56 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 50 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/1/2018 nunc pro tunc. Reply due by 6/25/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Highland Ranch Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Ranch Homeowners Association
Represented By: Karen M. Ayarbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVDG LLC Series 114
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Represented By: Timothy Rhoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Represented By: Timothy Rhoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Vatana Lay
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?