Howard v. Wickham et al
Petitioner: Lamont Howard
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Harold Wickham
Case Number: 3:2016cv00665
Filed: November 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDERED that the amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 21 ) is DENIED, and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Howard's motion for an evidentiary hearing (ECF No. 60 ) is DENIED. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that Howard is DENIED a certificate of appealability. The Clerk of Court shall enter final judgment accordingly and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting ECF No. 56 Motion to Extend Time: Petitioner will have until October 11, 2019, to file a reply in support of the merits of his amended petition (ECF No. 21 ). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting ECF No. 52 Motion to Extend Time: Petitioner will have until September 6, 2019, to file a reply in support of the merits of his amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 21 ). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 7/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER - Respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 29 ) is DENIED. Petitioner's motion for discovery (ECF No. 34 ) is DENIED. Respondents shall file an answer to the amended petition (ECF No. 21 ) by 6/10/2019. Reply due 30 days from service of the answer. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting ECF No. 45 Respondents' unopposed motion for enlargement of time to file a reply to ECF No. 29 Motion to Dismiss. Reply due by 3/7/2019. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that petitioner will have until 1/22/2019 to file an opposition to ECF No. 29 Motion to Dismiss and respondents will have until 2/5/2019 to file a reply. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that Petitioner's motion for extension of time (ECF No. 39 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner shall have until December 10, 2018, to file a reply to respondents' opposition to petitioner's motion for discovery (ECF No. 34 ). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 27 Motion to Extend Time : Answer/response to amended petition due by 10/26/2018. Absent a compelling showing of good cause, further extensions of time to respond or answer are unlikely to be granted. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting Motion to Extend Time (ECF No. 25 ) : Answer/response to amended petition (ECF No. 21 ) due by 10/12/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 22 Motion to Extend Time : Answer/response to amended petition (ECF No. 21 ) due by 9/13/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying without prejudice ECF No. 15 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery; granting ECF No. 17 Motion to Extend Time. First Amended Petition due by 5/30/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 3/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re ECF No. 13 Order. The hard copies of any exhibits filed by either counsel shall be delivered to the Reno Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - The FPD, through Jeremy C. Baron, Esq.,is appointed as counsel for petitioner. (E-service to CJA Coordinator 10/18/2017.) Amended petition due by 1/17/2018. Answer/response to amended petition due within 60 days of service of petition; Reply due within 30 days of service of answer. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that petitioner's motion for an extension to respond to the order to show cause (ECF No. 8 ) is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. The order to show cause (ECF No. 5 ) is HEREBY DISCHARGED. Petitioner's motion for counsel (ECF No. 7 ) is GRANTED. The FPD is appointed to represent petitioner. Clerk SHALL ELECTRONICALLY SERVE the FPD a copy of this order, together with a copy of the petition and its attachments (ECF No. 6 ). (E-service 5/15/2017; Petition via NEF regeneration.) T he FPD undertake direct representation of petitioner by 6/14/2017, or to indicate to the Court its inability to so. Clerk of Court SHALL add AG to the CM/ECF docket sheet and serve respondents with a copy of this order. (E-service 5/15/2017) Res pondents' counsel SHALL ENTER a notice of appearance by 5/25/2017. Clerk of Court SHALL SEND a copy of this order to the CJA Coordinator. (Email (NEF) sent to CJA coordinator 5/15/2017.) Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 5/15/2017 to reflect copy of order mailed to P at WSCC 5/15/2017 (DRM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Wickham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lamont Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harold Wickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?