Tremper vs Vining et al
Plaintiff: Edward Tremper
Defendant: Cynthia Ann Vining and John Vining
Case Number: 3:2016cv00707
Filed: December 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 20 is DENIED without prejudice to renew at the close of discovery as a motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 02/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties filed February 2, 2017 (ECF No. 18 ), the defendants are enjoined from disposing of or using the monies in defendant Cynthia Vinings Star One Credit Union account in her sole name, Account No. 124560860, until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Defendants shall file a response to the plaintiff's motion (ECF No. 15 ) no later than February 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Defendants' ECF No. 9 Emergency Motion to Seal; directing Clerk to seal ECF No. 6 -1; directing Defendants to file the redacted copy of Exhibit 1, attached as Exhibit 2 to the motion to seal, forthwith. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tremper vs Vining et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Tremper
Represented By: Kenneth J. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Ann Vining
Represented By: Courtney Miller O'Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vining
Represented By: Courtney Miller O'Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?