Pinder v. Byrnes et al
Plaintiff: Vincent H. Pinder
Defendant: Harold Mike Byrnes, Curtis Kerner, Wayne Oakley, Oxborrow and Shoultice
Case Number: 3:2016cv00742
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting ECF No. 94 Motion to Vacate. In the event the parties do not settle the matter at the Settlement Conference, Defendant Byrne shall have to and including December 9, 2020, in which to file his Dispositive Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 80 ) is accepted and adopted in full. Defendants' objection (ECF No. 87 ) is overruled. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 55 ) is granted in part and denied in part as specified herein. (See pdf order for specifics.) Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting ECF No. 83 Motion to Extend Time. As to Defendant Harold Mike Byrne, only: - Discovery due by Monday, September 14, 2020- Dispositive Motions due by Wednesday, October 14, 2020There shall be no further extensions granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER - The Courtroom Administrator shall calendar a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion (ECF No. 64 ) as soon as the Court's Calendar will accommodate it.Plaintiff shall be given an additional thirty (30) days from the date of this or der within which to file an opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 55 ). (See PDF image for additional details). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 53 Motion to Extend Time : Dispositive Motions due by Friday, 1/17/2020. There shall be no further extensions granted barring unforeseen and extenuating circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED P's # 6 Application to proceed IFP is GRANTED. However, even if this action is dismissed, the full $350 filing fee must still be paid. NDOC shall pay Clerk from inmate account. Clerk shall SEND copy this Order to Financ e and NDOC Inmate Services. ( E-mail (NEF) to Finance; Mailed to NDOC on 4/8//2019. ) Clerk shall SERVE this Order and Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 9 ). upon AG. (E-service to AG on 4/8/2019; complaint via NEF regeneration.) A G shall advise by 4/29/2019 re acceptance of service; and file under seal addresses for Ds for which service not accepted. P shall file a motion re any unserved Ds. If AG accepts service, then answer to complaint due by 6/7/2019. Henceforth P shall serve Ds or Ds' counsel a copy of every document submitted, together with a certificate of service. This case is no longer stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinder v. Byrnes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Mike Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Kerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxborrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoultice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent H. Pinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?