FLS Transportation Services (USA) Inc. v. Casillas et al
Plaintiff: FLS Transportation Services (USA) Inc.
Defendant: Arlien Casillas and OpenRoad Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00013
Filed: January 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting ECF No. 92 Stipulation for Dismissal of Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 60 & 61 Arlien Casillas's Motion to Disqualify. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying Defendant Casillas's ECF No. 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying Defendant OpenRoad's ECF No. 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Stipulation to vacate case management conference set for July 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying ECF No. 43 Stipulation. The parties have leave to submit a revised stipulated protective order that comports with LR IA 10-5(a) and the holdings in Kamakana and Pintos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting ECF No. 16 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 11 MOTION to Dismiss due by 3/17/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLS Transportation Services (USA) Inc. v. Casillas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlien Casillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenRoad Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLS Transportation Services (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Bant
Represented By: Brian W Boschee
Represented By: James W Puzey
Represented By: Robert W. Tomohlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?