McKnight v. United States Department of Education of Civil Rights Office
Plaintiff: Terria McKnight
Defendant: United States Department of Education of Civil Rights Office
Case Number: 3:2017cv00015
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDERED that Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 67 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting ECF No. 72 Stipulation : Motion Hearing re ECF No. 67 Motion for Summary Judgment set for 3/19/2019 at 1:30 PM in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that the Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 63 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER setting a Case Management Conference for 6/20/2018 at 1:30 PM in Reno Courtroom 2 before United States Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically shall dial 1-877-873-8017, enter the access code 3416460, and enter the security code 62018 approximately five minutes prior to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that the Fourth Amended Complaint may PROCEED; the claim under § 504 of the Rehabilitation Act is DISMISSED; the Motions for Screening ECF Nos. 50 , 51 are DENIED as moot; motions to dismiss or answers due by 4/17/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying as moot ECF No. 32 Motion to Dismiss; granting ECF No. 35 Motion to Dismiss; granting ECF No. 41 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend - Fourth Amended Complaint due within 28 days; granting ECF No. 36 Motion to Amend; denying as moot ECF No. 39 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that the Amended Complaint ECF No. 4 is STRICKEN; the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as to the NV Department of Education, Will Jensen, and Marva Cleven, with leave to amend in part within 28 days; the sixth cause of action is DISMISSED as against all Defendants, and any claims under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 are DISMISSED as against the NV Department of Education, without leave to amend; the Motion to Add More Definitive Statement ECF No. 29 is GRANTED; Lyon County is DISMISSED as a Defendant. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 08/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - ADOPTING AND ACCEPTING Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 3 ). Plaintiff's IFP application (ECF No. 1 ) is GRANTED. Clerk shall file the Complaint (ECF No. 1 -1). Plaintiff's request for damages against OCR under Section 504 Rehabilitation Act is STRICKEN from the Complaint. Count 1 of the Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Counts 2 and 3 are DISMISSED with leave to amend. Count 4 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to OCR. Plaintiff is permitted to PROCEED with Count 5. Count 6 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to OCR. Count 7 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to OCR. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKnight v. United States Department of Education of Civil Rights Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terria McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education of Civil Rights Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?