Zakouto v. Baca et al
Petitioner: Vitaly Zakouto
Respondent: Isidrio Baca and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2017cv00046
Filed: January 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that petitioner's motion (ECF No. 14 ) to stay is GRANTED and that this matter shall be STAYED until reopened by the Court, on motion or sua sponte, subject to the conditions set forth herein. FURTHER ORDERED that th e grant of a stay is conditioned upon petitioner returning to federal court, within sixty (60) days of issuance of the remittitur by the Nevada Supreme Court. FURTHER IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action until such time as the Court reopens the matter, either on motion or sua sponte. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to ECF No. 12 , petitioner will have until 2/28/2018 to file a motion addressing how they wish to proceed; respondents will have (30) days to file a respond; petitioner may file a reply within (14) from filing of the opposition, if any. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the application ECF No. 1 to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; that petitioner's motion ECF No. 4 for appointment of counsel is GRANTED; counsel appointed will represent petitioner in all federal proceedings re lated to this matter, including any appeals or certiorari proceedings, unless allowed to withdraw; the FPD shall be provisionally appointed as counsel and shall have (30) days to undertake direct representation of petitioner or to indicate to the Cou rt the office's inability to represent petitioner in these proceedings; Clerk to add AG as counsel for respondents and shall make electronic service of this order upon respondents (e-served on 09/29/2017); respondents' counsel shall enter a notice of appearance within (21) days of entry of this order; in the event that the FPD undertakes representation in this matter, within sixty (60) days of entry of this order, counsel for petitioner and respondents shall confer together and submi t, jointly if possible or separately if not, a proposed scheduling order for the initial proceedings in this case; Clerk to send a copy of this order to the pro se petitioner, the Nevada Attorney General, the Federal Public Defender, and the CJA Coo rdinator for this division (mailed to P and e-served on 09/29/2017); Clerk to provide copies of all prior filings herein to both the AG and FPD (NEF regenerated on 09/29/2017). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 09/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zakouto v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Isidrio Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vitaly Zakouto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?