Robertson v. State of Nevada Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Devon Robertson
Defendant: Russell Klein, Nevada Department of Health and Human Services and Gregory Thornton
Case Number: 3:2017cv00057
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's R&R (ECF No. 75 ) is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED; defendants' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement (ECF No. 58 ) is GRANTED; Exhibit A to ECF No. 58 is deemed to be the operative settlement a greement upon which judgment will be entered; settlement proceeds shall be dispersed as follows: 1. A check in the amount of $19,600.00 shall be made payable to HKM Employment Attorneys LLP. 2. A check in the amount of $29,400.00 shall be made payable to Devon Robertson. Clerk directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that Plaintiff's "Request for Electronic Access" (ECF No. 67 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's written certification due by 6/1/2018. See order for specific details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/14/2018. Order emailed to address provided in 67 motion and mailed to Plaintiff per Chambers on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 43 Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 3/26/2018. Motions due by 4/25/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that defendants' motion to dismiss ECF No. 32 is GRANTED in-part and DENIED in-part; Defendant Russell Klein is DISMISSED as a defendant; plaintiff's Equal Protection claim and Rehabilitation Act claim are DISMIS SED in their entirety from plaintiffs second amended complaint ECF No. 29 ; only claims moving forward are plaintiff's first cause of action for First Amendment retaliation against defendant Gregory Thornton as it relates to plaintiff 9;s termination of employment and second cause of action for a hostile work environment in violation of Title VII against defendant State of Nevada, ex rel. its Department of Health and Human Services. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting ECF No. 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's first cause of action for First Amendment Retaliation and second cause of action for an Equal Protection violation are DISMISSED without prejudice; Plai ntiff has have until 08/07/2017 to file a final amended complaint; if an amended complaint is not filed, action to proceed only on plaintiff's Title VII and Rehabilitation Act claims. Amended Complaint deadline: 8/7/2017. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 07/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 7 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. State of Nevada Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Klein
Represented By: Shannon Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Shannon Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Thornton
Represented By: Shannon Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Robertson
Represented By: Julie Cavanaugh-Bill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?