Christiana Trust, a Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but as Trustee of ARLP Trust 3 v. Thunder Properties, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christiana Trust
Defendant: Fallen Leaf Homeowners Association, Cheryl L. Morden, Paul E. Morden, The Clarkson Law Group, P.C. and Thunder Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00089
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that the Plaintiff's Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (ECF No. 48 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting ECF No. 46 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendants Thunder Properties, Inc. and Fallen Leaf Homeowners Association with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that the parties shall file a status report with the Court and/or a stipulated dismissal on or before 6/8/2018 at 5:00 PM. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re ECF No. 41 Notice of Settlement; this matter is stayed until 6/2/2018; Oral Argument set for 5/8/18 at 10:00 AM is VACATED; the parties shall file a joint status report or dismissal papers by 6/2/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting ECF No. 37 Stipulation to Extend Time to respond to ECF No. 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 3/22/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting ECF No. 35 Stipulation for Extension of Time to respond to ECF No. 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' response due 1/22/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ECF No. 31 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendant the Clarkson Law Group, P.C. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christiana Trust, a Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but as Trustee of ARLP Trust 3 v. Thunder Properties, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christiana Trust
Represented By: Benjamin D. Petiprin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fallen Leaf Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl L. Morden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Morden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Clarkson Law Group, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?