Enos v. Douglas County et al
Plaintiff: John Enos
Defendant: Douglas, County of, Nevada, State of and Scott Shick
Case Number: 3:2017cv00095
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 AMENDED ORDER re ECF No. 146 Order to Enlarge Time : Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by Friday, 1/8/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting ECF No. 140 Stipulation. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/2/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER approving ECF No. 136 Stipulation. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/19/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting ECF No. 134 Stipulation. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by Thursday, August 20, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting ECF No. 132 Stipulation. Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/19/2020.Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting ECF No. 128 Stipulation. Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 107 ) is denied.Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 106 ) is GRANTED only as to Plaintiff's claim for tortious discharge against Sauer-Lamb and cl aim for breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing as to all Defendants. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 106 ) is DENIED as to all other claims. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting ECF No. 121 Stipulation to Extend Time re ECF Nos. 106 and 107 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 10/22/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting ECF No. 119 Stipulation to Extend Time : Replies to ECF Nos. 114 , 115 Responses re ECF Nos. 106 , 107 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting ECF No. 116 Stipulation : Replies to ECF Nos. 114 , 115 Responses re ECF Nos. 106 , 107 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment due by 10/1/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER approving ECF No. 112 Stipulation re ECF Nos. 106 , 107 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment: Responses due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting ECF No. 110 Stipulation To Extend Time re ECF Nos. 106 and 107 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 8/30/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting ECF No. 108 Stipulation : Responses to ECF Nos. 107 , 106 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 97 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 4/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting ECF No. 58 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to file opposition to ECF No. 57 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 1/16/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER approving ECF No. 55 Stipulation re ECF No. 48 Amended Complaint. Michael P. Gibbons and Nathan Todd Young answers due 12/26/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 17 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 5 MOTION to Dismiss due by 6/9/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enos v. Douglas County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Shick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Enos
Represented By: William J. Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?