Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC v. Rae Nola Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, Quality Loan Service Corporation and Rae Nola Edwards
Counter Claimant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Counter Defendant: Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00162
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting ECF No. 152 Stipulation of Dismissal: Springland Village Homeowners Association dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting ECF No. 147 Stipulation of Dismissal: Federal National Mortgage Association dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Champery Rental REO LLC against Unknown Heirs of Nola Rae Edwards. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting to ECF No. 137 Stipulation for Disbursement of Surplus Funds and Dismissal of Interpleader (See order for specific details and information). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER approving ECF No. 131 Stipulation for 1. Disclaimer of Interest and 2. Dismissal of Cross-Claim against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, and GMAC Mortgage LLC. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER approving ECF No. 118 Stipulation, setting aside ECF No. 117 Clerk's Default. Re ECF No. 82 Crossclaim, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc's answer due 4/27/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting ECF No. 77 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to respond to ECF No. 61 Third Amended Complaint. Kern & Associates, Ltd. answer/response due 4/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting ECF No. 72 Stipulation : Springland Village Homeowners Association answer to ECF No. 61 Third Amended Complaint due by 3/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting ECF No. 66 Defendant Kern & Associates, Ltd.'s Stipulation for Extension of Time to answer/respond to ECF No. 61 Third Amended Complaint. Defendant Kern & Associates, Ltd.'s answer/response due by 3/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying without prejudice ECF No. 17 Motion to Remand to State Court; Clerk instructed to strike ECF No. 39 Amended Complaint. Champery must file a second amended complaint omitting parties by 11/3/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Stipulation (ECF No. 34 ) to Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order (ECF No 15 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting ECF No. 22 Motion to Substitute the Unknown Heirs of Rae Nola Edwards, Expand Time to Serve, and Allow Service of Process by Publication. The deadline to serve the Unknown Heirs is extended an additional 90 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC v. Rae Nola Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Jory C. Garabedian
Represented By: Laurel I. Handley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Jory C. Garabedian
Represented By: Laurel I. Handley
Represented By: Anthony R Sassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Beckom
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rae Nola Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Casey Joel Nelson
Represented By: Bradley G. Sims
Represented By: John T Steffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Casey Joel Nelson
Represented By: Bradley G. Sims
Represented By: John T Steffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?