Warren v. Nev. Dept. of Corr. et al
Plaintiff: Keith A. Warren
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections, Nevada, State of, S. Powers, Chandra Thomas and Harold Wickham
Case Number: 3:2017cv00228
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER - Plaintiff's "Motion to Re-Open Discovery" (ECF No. 196 ) is denied. The Dispositive Motion deadline remains set for April 16, 2021, and the deadline to file the Joint Pretrial Order is May 14, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 184 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 170 Motion for Sanctions due by 3/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting ECF No. 172 Motion to Extend Time re ECF No. 160 Motion for Order of Contempt of Court, ECF No. 161 Motion for Order to Show Cause for TRO. Responses due by 2/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting ECF No. 108 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline to serve responses to the outstanding discovery is Friday, November 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER DENYING ECF No. 104 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting ECF No. 101 Motion to Extend Time : Deadline for outstanding discovery specified herein is Monday, 9/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting ECF No. 99 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline to serve responses to the request for admissions and requests for production of documents in this case is extended to Monday, August 31, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion (ECF No. 94 ) is GRANTED. The Court will enter an Amended Scheduling Order for this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER - Defendants Chandra Thomas and Ramirez are dismissed without prejudice from this action. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER - The Court will defer ruling on Plaintiff's Request (ECF No. 77 ) until Chief District Judge Miranda M. Du issues her decision on Defendants' Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order (ECF No. 78 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb (ECF No. 46 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety; Plaintiff's motion for leave to file the Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 32 ) is granted; Cler k directed to file the SAC (ECF No. 32 -1) and send Plaintiff a courtesy copy (Attached hereto for distribution to P); some claims permitted to proceed; Clerk directed to electronically serve a copy of this order and ECF No. 32 -1 Plaintiff& #039;s SAC on AG (E-service on 12/2/2019); AG to advise Court within (21) days of the date of entry of this order re acceptance of service and/or provide last-known-address information under seal; plaintiff to file a motion identifying the uns erved defendant(s), requesting issuance of a summons, and specifying a full name and address for the defendant(s); answer/response due within 60 days for any defendants represented. See order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/2/2019. (Attachments: # 1 ECF No. 32-1 Second Amended Complaint)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting ECF No. 36 Motion to Extend Time re ECF No. 29 Scheduling Order. Responses to the request for admissions due by 10/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that the court will review the motion for leave to amend (ECF No. 32 ) in due course and will screen the proposed amended complaint under 28 U.S.C. § 1915A; if Defendants wish to assert an argument that the proposed second amended compla int fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, they will have until 9/19/2019 to do so. See order pdf for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED ECF No. 1 IFP application is GRANTED. If this action is dismissed, the full $350 filing fee must still be paid Further ordered NDOC shall pay clerk from inmate account. Clerk shall SEND copy this order to Finance and ND OC Inmate Services. (E-service (NEF) to Finance; mail to NDOC on 6/3/2019.) Clerk shall e-SERVE AG copy this order, and copy of ECF No. 10 Amended Complaint by adding AG to docket. (E-service 6/3/2019; Amended Complaint via NEF regeneration.) A G shall advise by 6/24/2019 re acceptance of service, and file under seal Ds' address(es) for which service not accepted. D shall provide address(es) re any unserved Ds. If service accepted, then answer due 8/2/2019. Henceforth P shall serve Ds copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. P's ECF No. 18 Motion for summons is denied. This case is no longer stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Nev. Dept. of Corr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandra Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Wickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A. Warren
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?