Goggin v. Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert M Goggin
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00262
Filed: April 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER dismissing Enterprise's Third-Party Complaint (ECF No. 61 ) without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER that Enterprise shall have until August 31, 2018 within which to show cause why this court should not dismiss Enterprise's third party complaint (ECF No. 61 ) against third party defendant James Sidney Proctor. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting ECF No. 101 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to File a Reply to ECF No. 89 Motion for Summary Judgment (Second Request). Reply due by 6/7/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting ECF No. 97 Stipulation for extension of time Re: ECF No. 89 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 5/18/2018. Reply due by 6/4/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting ECF No. 92 Stipulation for extension of time to file reply to ECF No. 87 Motion to Strike. Reply due by 5/2/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that Enterprise's request for permission to take the deposition and obtain the records of the Person(s) Most Knowledgeable and Custodian(s) of Records for the Department of the U.S. Navy is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting ECF No. 64 Defendant Enterprise's request for permission to take the deposition of James S. Proctor at the Stewart Conservation Camp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER approving ECF No. 56 Stipulation re ECF No. 49 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer: Reply due by 11/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - Defendants Motion to stay discovery (ECF No. 23 ) is DENIED as moot. The scheduling order issued on June 9, 2017 (ECF No. 25 ) shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part ECF No. 4 Motion to Dismiss as to plaintiff's claim for permissive use; plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before 07/11/2017; denying without prejudice ECF No. 29 Enterprise's Motion for Leave to supplement; granting ECF No. 30 Motion to Seal Exhibit 2 to the Motion to Supplement ECF No. 30 . Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 06/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) Modified on 6/28/2017 to correct typo (KW).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goggin v. Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Bedker
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M Goggin
Represented By: William C. Jeanney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?