Gerald Peters Gallery, Inc., et al. VS. Peter Stremmel, et al.
Plaintiff: Gerald Peters Gallery, Inc. and Gerald Peters
Defendant: Coeur d' Alene Art Auction of Nevada, L.L.C., Mike Overby, Peter Stremmel and Stremmel Galleries, LTD
Case Number: 3:2017cv00273
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER that Defendants' motion for attorneys' fees and costs (ECF No. 64 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 52 ) is granted; Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 42 ) is denied as moot; Clerk instructed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting ECF No 53 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 52 ). Responses due by 4/9/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 50 motion to quash or modify subpoenas to plaintiffs' testifying experts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting ECF No. 34 Motion for Leave to Amend; revised amended complaint due within (7) days; ECF No. 20 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot; Court vacates the hearing set for 11/08/2017 ECF No. 35 . Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerald Peters Gallery, Inc., et al. VS. Peter Stremmel, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coeur d' Alene Art Auction of Nevada, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark H. Gunderson
Represented By: Austin Kent Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Overby
Represented By: Mark H. Gunderson
Represented By: Austin Kent Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Stremmel
Represented By: Mark H. Gunderson
Represented By: Austin Kent Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stremmel Galleries, LTD
Represented By: Mark H. Gunderson
Represented By: Austin Kent Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Peters Gallery, Inc.
Represented By: Dane W. Anderson
Represented By: David W. Peterson
Represented By: Kurt Wihl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Peters
Represented By: Dane W. Anderson
Represented By: David W. Peterson
Represented By: Kurt Wihl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?