United States of America v. Nevada Cement Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Nevada Cement Company, Inc.
Movant: United States Attorney for the District of Nevada
Case Number: 3:2017cv00302
Filed: May 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED CONSENT DECREE Re: ECF No. 12 -1. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT DECREE re ECF No. 2 -1 Proposed Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting ECF No. 4 Motion to Admit Government Attorney Steven O'Rourke. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Nevada Cement Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Cement Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States Attorney for the District of Nevada
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Represented By: Steven W. Myhre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Represented By: David Lee McIlwain
Represented By: Steven W. Myhre
Represented By: Steven O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?