January 10, 2022 |
Filing
66
ORDER TO TRANSPORT PLAINTIFF AND ORDER TO TEST NDOC INMATE FOR IN-PERSON COURT PROCEEDINGS : NDOC shall transport inmate Kevin Ray Holmes, NDOC #63616, to the Bruce R. Thompson Federal Courthouse, 400 South Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada, to per sonally attend the jury trial set for 8:30 A.M., Monday, February 7, 2022, in Reno Courtroom Number 3, before Judge Robert C. Jones. NDOC, shall arrange for Holmes to be tested for COVID-19 within 14 days of the hearing and with Holmes' consent. Clerk of the Court shall provide a courtesy copy of this Order to the U.S. Marshals Office in Reno, Nevada. (Emailed to USM on 1/10/2022.) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/10/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 10, 2021 |
Filing
57
ORDER - The parties shall file the joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than March 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
October 6, 2020 |
Filing
55
ORDER denying ECF No. 54 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
September 17, 2020 |
Filing
53
ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 52 ) is ADOPTED IN PART and REJECTED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendan's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 44 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Th e Court grants summary judgment in favor of Defendants as to the retaliation claim and denies summary judgment as to the equal protection claim against Defendant Skulstad. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's request under Rule 56(f), now Rule 56(d), is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 10, 2020 |
Filing
43
ORDER - Defendants shall have to and including Wednesday, February 19, 2020, in which to respond to Plaintiff's motion (ECF No. 42 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
August 1, 2019 |
Filing
16
ORDERED P's ECF No. 1 IFP Application is GRANTED. However, even if this action is dismissed, the full $350 filing fee must still be paid. NDOC shall pay Clerk from inmate account. Clerk shall SEND copy this Order to Finance an d NDOC Inmate Services. ( E-mail (NEF) to Finance; Mailed to NDOC on 8/1/2019. ) Clerk shall SERVE this Order and Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 8 ). upon AG. (E-service to AG on 8/1/2019/2019; amended complaint via NEF regenera tion.) AG shall advise by 8/22/2019 re acceptance of service; and file under seal addresses for Ds for which service not accepted. P shall file a motion re any unserved Ds. If AG accepts service, then answer to complaint due by 9/30/2019. Hencefor th P shall serve Ds or Ds' counsel a copy of every document submitted, together with a certificate of service. This case is no longer stayed. The motion to amend title (ECF No. 10 ) is construed as a motion to substitute Defendant Doe Director of NDOC to Defendant James Dzurenda. Clerk is directed to change Defendant Doe Director of NDOC to James Dzurenda on the docket sheet. The portion of Count II, alleging a retaliation claim, will now proceed against Defendant James Dzurenda as well. (See ECF No. 9 at 8). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
November 6, 2018 |
Filing
7
ORDER that a decision on the IFP Application (ECF No. 1 ) is DEFERRED; Count I may PROCEED against Defendant Skulstad; Count II is DISMISSED, with leave to amend by 12/4/2018; Defendants Baca, Moyle, and Ward are DISMI SSED from the action; Clerk directed to send Plaintiff the approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, instructions, and a copy of the First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 6 ) (Mailed to P on 11/6/2018); a separate screening order will be done by the Court if a second amended complaint is filed; if Plaintiff does not timely file a second amended complaint, the Court may dismiss Count II with prejudice without further notice, and the action will then proceed only against Defendant Skulstad on the equal protection claim. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|