Kuzmicki v. Hanrahan et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Kuzmicki
Defendant: Brandon Gardner, David Hanrahan, Samantha Hanrahan, Sgt. Shelly and Warren R. Westad
Case Number: 3:2017cv00342
Filed: May 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 22 ) is adopted and accepted; this case is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to file a second amended Complaint; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation ECF No. 12 is ADOPTED AND ACCEPTED; plaintiff's claims against Sergeant Shelly is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment claims against David Hanraha n, Samantha Hanrahan, and Warren Westad are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; plaintiff's remaining claims against David Hanrahan, Samantha Hanrahan, and Warren Westad are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file a second amended complaint ECF No. 15 is GRANTED; plaintiff to file a second amended complaint before 8/30/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's claims against Sergeant Shelly be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment due process and equal protection claims against David Hanrahan, Samantha Hanrahan, and Warren Wes tad be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; remaining claims against David Hanrahan, Samantha Hanrahan, and Warren Westad be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file a second amended complaint remedying defects by 06/03/2018. Objections to R&R due by 5/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Court ADOPTS AND ACCEPTS the Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge ECF No. 3 ; granting ECF No. 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Clerk directed to file Plaintiff's C omplaint ECF No. 1 -1; Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND as to Defendants Shelly, S. Hanrahan, D. Hanrahan and Westad and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Gardner; granting ECF No. 4 Motion to Extend Tim e to file amended complaint; amended complaint due by 11/27/2017; ECF No. 5 Motion for Appointment of Public Defendant ECF No. 5 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. 1 ; Clerk FILED Plaintiff's Complaint ECF No. 1 -1; the complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND< /B> as to claims against defendant Shelly, S. Hanrahan, D. Hanrahan, and Westad; the complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to claims against Defendant Gardner.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file an amended complaint remedying the defects identified in order by 10/11/2017. Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 09/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuzmicki v. Hanrahan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Shelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren R. Westad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Kuzmicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?