Webb v. Federal Court Staff et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Webb
Defendant: Clerk's Office Reno NV, Federal Court Staff and Federal Marshals
Case Number: 3:2017cv00350
Filed: June 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 8/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff's application to proceed IFP (ECF No. 1 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall submit a new, complete IFP application within THIRTY DAYS of the date of this Order. The application shall clearly identify her i ncome, assets, expenses and liabilities. A failure to do so, or to pay the full filing fee, will result in a report and recommendation that this action be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Federal Court Staff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk's Office Reno NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Court Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Marshals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?